DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC v. Objecting Minority Noteholders to the Proposed Consent Judgment Between The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and The National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I et al

Plaintiff: DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC
Defendant: The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3, The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2004-1, The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-3, The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2003-1, The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-2, The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-2, Objecting Minority Noteholders to the Proposed Consent Judgment Between The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and The National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I, The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-3, The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-4, The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-1, The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2004-2, The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-1, The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-4, The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1 and The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-2
Respondent: U.S. Bank National Ass'n, solely as Indenture Trustee and Successor Special Servicer
Case Number: 1:2019cv00352
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 43 REDACTED VERSION of (42 in 1:19-cv-00352-MN) Letter, (149 in 1:17-cv-01323-MN) Letter by AG Mortgage Value Partners Master Fund, L.P., AG Opportunistic Whole Loan Select, L.P., AG Super RMBS LLC, AG TCDRS, L.P., AG Pisgah, L.P., Baldr Sherwood Fund, Inc., LibreMax MSW Fund, Ltd., LibreMax Master Fund, Ltd., LibreMax Value Master Fund, Ltd., OWS ABS Master Fund II, L.P., OWS COF I Master, L.P., OWS Credit Opportunity I, LLC, OWS Global Fixed Income Fund (USD-Hedged), Ltd., One William Street Capital Master Fund, Ltd., Waterfall Delta Offshore Master Fund, LP, Waterfall Eden Master Fund, Ltd., Waterfall Sandstone Fund, LP.. (Cordo, Andrew)
April 5, 2019 CASE CLOSED per the Court's disposition of the Motion to Quash during the 4/4/2019 teleconference. (dlw)
April 4, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference held on 4/4/2019. The transcript shall serve as the Court's rulings on the various issued raised. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins.) Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01323-MN, 1:19-cv-00352-MN, 1:19-mc-00067-MN(dlw)
April 4, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Adam J. Levitt for DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
April 2, 2019 Filing 42 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Andrew D. Cordo regarding response to April 1 Letter from DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Cordo, Andrew)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORAL ORDER re (27 in 1:19-mc-00067-MN, 138 in 1:17-cv-01323-MN, 39 in 1:19-cv-00352-MN) Letter - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the suggestion referring "the Court to the fully briefed motions" fails to comply with the Court's 3/25/2019 Oral Order (D.I. 134) and is rejected. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/2/2019. (dlw)
April 2, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stephen H. Meyer, Joseph B. Sconyers, and Keith M. Kollmeyer for U.S. Bank National Ass'n, solely as Indenture Trustee and Successor Special Servicer added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
April 1, 2019 Filing 40 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Robert J. Kriner, Jr. regarding motion to quash filed by DiCello Levitt & Casey LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Cramer, Tiffany)
April 1, 2019 Filing 39 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Andrew D. Cordo regarding motions to quash filed by DiCello Levitt & Casey and Boston Portfolio Advisors. (Cordo, Andrew)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Hanin and Uri Itkin filed by Objecting Minority Noteholders to the Proposed Consent Judgment Between The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and The National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/1/2019. (dlw)
March 29, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Hanin and Uri Itkin - filed by Objecting Minority Noteholders to the Proposed Consent Judgment Between The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and The National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I. (Cordo, Andrew)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Keith Kollmeyer, Joseph B. Sconyers and Stephen H. Meyer filed by U.S. Bank National Ass'n, solely as Indenture Trustee and Successor Special Servicer. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/27/2019. (dlw)
March 26, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Keith Kollmeyer, Joseph B. Sconyers and Stephen H. Meyer - filed by U.S. Bank National Ass'n, solely as Indenture Trustee and Successor Special Servicer. (Castellano, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance of John W. Shaw, Jeff Castellano, and David M. Fry by U.S. Bank National Ass'n, solely as Indenture Trustee and Successor Special Servicer (Castellano, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Dieter Cordo on behalf of Objecting Minority Noteholders to the Proposed Consent Judgment Between The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and The National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I (Cordo, Andrew)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORAL ORDER - Having reviewed Plaintiff's 3/22/2019 letter 133 filed in C.A. No. 17-1323, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) the discovery dispute teleconference set for 4/1/2019 is rescheduled to 4/4/2019 at 2:00 p.m.; (2) any party with a discovery dispute regarding subpoena compliance shall file an opening letter not to exceed three (3) pages on 4/1/2019; and (3) any responsive letter(s) not to exceed three (3) pages shall be filed on 4/2/2019. Ambac Assurance Corporation is to initiate the call to Chambers once all parties are on the line 302-573-4559. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/25/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01323-MN, 1:19-cv-00352-MN, 1:19-mc-00067-MN(dlw)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #33 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amy E. Keller, #32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam J. Levitt filed by DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/21/2019. (dlw)
March 21, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amy E. Keller - filed by DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC. (Cramer, Tiffany)
March 21, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam J. Levitt - filed by DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC. (Cramer, Tiffany)
March 13, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Vera Gerrit Belger on behalf of DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC (Belger, Vera)
March 13, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Kriner, Jr on behalf of DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC (Kriner, Robert)
March 13, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Joanne Cramer on behalf of DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC (Cramer, Tiffany)
February 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (bkb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 28 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/25/2019. (nmg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 27 Record of case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number in Other District: 1:19-cv-00252. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
February 20, 2019 Filing 26 TRANSFERRED to the District of Delaware the electronic record. (gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Defendants Objecting Minority Noteholder' motion to transfer (dkt. #12 ) is granted. The clerk is directed to transfer this action forthwith to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware for consolidation with the pending action Consumer Fin. Prot. Bureau v. The Natl Collegiate Master Student Loan Tr., et al., C.A. No. 17-1323-MN. See statement. Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 2/19/2019:Mailed notice(gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY by Plaintiff DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC to motion to quash #2 Reply in Support of Motion to Quash and for Protective Order (Keller, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY by Defendant Objecting Minority Noteholders to the Proposed Consent Judgment Between The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and The National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit)(Morsch, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion to appear pro hac vice #17 is moot. Motion to appear pro hac vice #21 is granted. Attorney Uri Alexander Itkin is added as counsel for Objecting Minority Noteholders. Mailed notice (ags, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15470333. (Itkin, Uri) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE by DiCello Levitt & Casey LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Objecting Minority Noteholders to the Proposed Consent Judgment Between The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and The National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I, Respondent U.S. Bank National Ass'n, solely as Indenture #12 Opposition to Motion to Transfer (Keller, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by Objecting Minority Noteholders to the Proposed Consent Judgment Between The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and The National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I, U.S. Bank National Ass'n, solely as Indenture Trustee and Successor Special Servicer in Opposition to motion to quash #2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Hirst, Morgan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion to appear pro hac vice #16 is granted. Attorney Michael Hanin is added as counsel for Objecting Minority Noteholders. Mailed notice (ags, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15461618. U.A. Itkin (Morsch, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15461389. M. A. HANIN (Morsch, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Objecting Minority Noteholders to the Proposed Consent Judgment Between The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and The National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I by James A. Morsch (Morsch, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Objecting Minority Noteholders to the Proposed Consent Judgment Between The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and The National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I, U.S. Bank National Ass'n, solely as Indenture Trustee and Successor Special Servicer re MOTION by Defendant Objecting Minority Noteholders to the Proposed Consent Judgment Between The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and The National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I, Respondent U.S. Bank National Ass'n, solely as Indenture #12 , memorandum in support of motion, #13 (Hirst, Morgan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Objecting Minority Noteholders to the Proposed Consent Judgment Between The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and The National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I, U.S. Bank National Ass'n, solely as Indenture Trustee and Successor Special Servicer in support of motion to transfer case, #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Hirst, Morgan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Objecting Minority Noteholders to the Proposed Consent Judgment Between The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and The National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I, Respondent U.S. Bank National Ass'n, solely as Indenture Trustee and Successor Special Servicer to transfer case (Hirst, Morgan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion to transfer is due by 1/25/2019. Responses to the motion to quash and for protective order #2 and motion for transfer are due by 2/8/2019; replies by 2/15/2019. Status hearing is set for 2/27/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent U.S. Bank National Ass'n, solely as Indenture Trustee and Successor Special Servicer by Morgan Reid Hirst (Hirst, Morgan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15397668. (Levitt, Adam) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Amy Elisabeth Keller for presentment of motion to quash #2 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/23/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Keller, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC regarding MOTION by Plaintiff DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC to quash Subpoena and for Protective Order #2 , memorandum in support of motion #3 (Keller, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC by Adam J. Levitt (Levitt, Adam) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC by Adam M. Prom (Prom, Adam) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC by Amy Elisabeth Keller (Keller, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM by DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC in support of motion to quash #2 Subpoena and for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Keller, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION by Plaintiff DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC to quash Subpoena and for Protective Order (Keller, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Levitt, Adam) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC v. Objecting Minority Noteholders to the Proposed Consent Judgment Between The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and The National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2004-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2003-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Objecting Minority Noteholders to the Proposed Consent Judgment Between The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and The National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I
Represented By: Andrew Dieter Cordo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2004-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Vera Gerrit Belger
Represented By: Tiffany Joanne Cramer
Represented By: Robert J. Kriner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Bank National Ass'n, solely as Indenture Trustee and Successor Special Servicer
Represented By: Keith M. Kollmeyer
Represented By: David M. Fry
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Joseph B. Sconyers
Represented By: Stephen H. Meyer
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Castellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?