Smith v. Town of Dewey Beach, Delaware et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey C. Smith
Defendant: Larry Silver, SGT. Clifford Dempsey, Town of Dewey Beach, Delaware and Mayor T.J. Redefer
Case Number: 1:2019cv00360
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Referring Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORAL ORDER: The case is now REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for all purposes through the case dispositive motion deadline. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/28/2019. (nms)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer Complaint to April 29, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Clifford Dempsey answer due 4/29/2019; T.J. Redefer answer due 4/29/2019; Larry Silver answer due 4/29/2019; Town of Dewey Beach, Delaware answer due 4/29/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/14/2019. (nms)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer Complaint to April 29, 2019 - filed by Clifford Dempsey, T.J. Redefer, Larry Silver, Town of Dewey Beach, Delaware. (Mondros, Herbert)
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Herbert Weiswasser Mondros on behalf of All Defendants (Mondros, Herbert)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey C. Smith. All Defendants. (Norman, Stephen)
February 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (bkb)
February 22, 2019 Remark : Summons forms mailed to counsel per their request. (rwc)
February 21, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Clifford Dempsey on 2/21/2019; T.J. Redefer on 2/21/2019; Larry Silver on 2/21/2019; Town of Dewey Beach, Delaware on 2/21/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Clifford Dempsey, T.J. Redefer, Larry Silver, Town of Dewey Beach, Delaware - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2575221.) - filed by Jeffrey C. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Town of Dewey Beach, Delaware et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Silver
Represented By: Diane M. Coffey
Represented By: Herbert Weiswasser Mondros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. Clifford Dempsey
Represented By: Diane M. Coffey
Represented By: Herbert Weiswasser Mondros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Dewey Beach, Delaware
Represented By: Diane M. Coffey
Represented By: Herbert Weiswasser Mondros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor T.J. Redefer
Represented By: Diane M. Coffey
Represented By: Herbert Weiswasser Mondros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey C. Smith
Represented By: Stephen Price Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?