UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund v. Amgen Inc. et al
Plaintiff: UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis Inc., Actavis Pharma Inc., Amgen Inc. and Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00369
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (62 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS, 78 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 262 in 1:19-cv-00044-LPS, 82 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 112 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 125 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Niketa K. Patel filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/28/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS et al. (ntl)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Niketa K. Patel - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Shaw, John)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Karen Lin as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer associated with Mayer Brown LLP. (Shaw, John)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REDACTED VERSION of (71 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,,, (86 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 62 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 42 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Redacted Document,, (52 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (32 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Bifferato, Ian)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REDACTED VERSION of (98 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Reply Brief, (51 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Reply Brief, (71 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Reply Brief by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Bifferato, Ian)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 REDACTED VERSION of (53 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (61 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 84 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 41 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Redacted Document,, (73 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,,, (33 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Bifferato, Ian)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 REDACTED VERSION of (58 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 45 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 26 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Redacted Document,, (33 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (24 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (43 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Bifferato, Ian)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following motions to dismiss are referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall: D.I. 25, 27, 30, 31, and 34 in 19md2895; D.I. 238, 240 in 19cv44; D.I. 39, 42 in 19cv369; D.I. 57, 60 in 19cv396; D.I. 24, 27 in 19cv1460; and D.I. 21, 23 in 19cv1461. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/6/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS et al. (ntl)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. re (23 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (31 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (238 in 1:19-cv-00044-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (60 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (25 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, (27 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (42 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Keller, Karen)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Ian Connor Bifferato and Tiffany J. regarding requesting oral argument - re (23 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (27 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (31 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (42 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Bifferato, Ian)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER re (59 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS)(50 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) (93 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS)(70 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS)(97 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Seal Document: Reply Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Pharma Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/15/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 1:19-cv-01461-LPS (ntl)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REPLY BRIEF re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Actavis Pharma Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION to Seal Document: Reply Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss - filed by Actavis Pharma Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, Karen)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund re (53 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (55 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (32 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (33 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (71 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,,, (76 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (73 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,,, (52 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (35 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bifferato, Ian)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (48 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS, 68 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 91 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 57 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 93 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ashley E. Johnson and Eric J. Stock filed by Amgen Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/20/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 1:19-cv-01461-LPS (ntl)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ashley E. Johnson and Eric J. Stock - filed by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.s Disclosures under Paragraph 3 of the District of Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE OF SERVICE of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to District of Delaware Default Standard Paragraph 3 filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.(Bifferato, Ian)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amgen Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Amgen Inc..(Egan, Brian)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re (34 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS, 54 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 75 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Seal End Payor Plaintiffs' Motion to File Their Brief in Opposition to Amgen's Motion to Dismiss End Payor Plaintiff's Consolidated Class Action Complaint Under Seal filed by TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/16/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-01461-LPS (ntl)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re (69 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 79 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 45 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) MOTION to Seal Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to File Their Joint Briefs in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Under Seal filed by KPH HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., Cesar Castillo, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/16/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 1:19-cv-01461-LPS (ntl)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REDACTED VERSION of (71 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,,, (52 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (32 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Plaintiffs Joint Brief in Opposition to Defendant Amgen Inc.s Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaints by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bifferato, Ian)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REDACTED VERSION of (53 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (73 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,,, (33 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Plaintiffs Joint Brief in Opposition to Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.s, Watson Laboratories, Inc.s and Actavis Pharma, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bifferato, Ian)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REDACTED VERSION of (76 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (55 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, (35 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,, End Payor Plaintiffs Brief in Opposition to Defendant Amgen Inc.s Motion to Dismiss End Payor Plaintiffs Consolidated Class Action Complaint by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bifferato, Ian)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas to Produce Documents filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.(Bifferato, Ian)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Teva Pharmaceutical USA Inc.'s Initial Disclosures filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A) filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.(Bifferato, Ian)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amgen Inc.'s Initial Disclosures filed by Amgen Inc..(Egan, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #54 MOTION to Seal End Payor Plaintiffs' Motion to File Their Brief in Opposition to Amgen's Motion to Dismiss End Payor Plaintiff's Consolidated Class Action Complaint Under Seal, #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim End Payor Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Defendant Amgen Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss End Payor Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Declaration)(Bifferato, Ian)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION to Seal End Payor Plaintiffs' Motion to File Their Brief in Opposition to Amgen's Motion to Dismiss End Payor Plaintiff's Consolidated Class Action Complaint Under Seal - filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bifferato, Ian)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Seal Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' and Indirect Purchased Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to File Their Joint Briefs in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Under Seal, #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Plaintiffs' Joint Brief in Opposition to Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s, Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s, and Actavis Pharma, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bifferato, Ian)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Seal Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' and Indirect Purchased Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to File Their Joint Briefs in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Under Seal, #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Plaintiffs' Joint Brief in Opposition to Defendant Amgen Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaints filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bifferato, Ian)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION to Seal Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' and Indirect Purchased Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to File Their Joint Briefs in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Under Seal - filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bifferato, Ian)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amgen's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Amended Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Amgen filed by Amgen Inc..(Egan, Brian)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE OF SERVICE of a Subpoena to Produce Documents filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.(Bifferato, Ian)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas to Produce Documents filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.(Bifferato, Ian)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re (25 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 38 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 29 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 20 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS, 59 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) MOTION to File Brief Under Seal filed by Actavis Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Actavis plc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis Pharma Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/24/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 1:19-cv-01461-LPS (ntl)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REDACTED VERSION of (33 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (24 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (61 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (28 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (43 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, by Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Pharma Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REDACTED VERSION of (22 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (40 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (32 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, of Its Motion to Dismiss End Payor Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of counsel, D.I. 41 was removed from the docket as it is a duplicative filing. (ntl)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Actavis Pharma Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/29/2019. (Keller, Karen)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Actavis Pharma Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, Karen)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Amgen Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/29/2019. (Egan, Brian)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Dismiss - filed by Actavis Pharma Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis plc, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, Karen)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REDACTED VERSION of (35 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 12 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 17 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) Amended Complaint,, by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bifferato, Ian)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re (16 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS, 34 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 11 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS) MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/16/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-01461-LPS (ntl)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 [SEALED] AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint against Actavis Inc., Actavis Pharma Inc., Amgen Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis plc, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.- filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.(Bifferato, Ian)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint - filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 237 RETIREES' BENEFIT FUND, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bifferato, Ian)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (8 in 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 11 in 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 45 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 32 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 14 in 1:19-cv-01461-LPS) STIPULATION and Order Regarding the Filing of Consolidated Pleading and Responses to Consolidated Pleading. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/29/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS, 1:19-cv-01460-LPS, 1:19-cv-01461-LPS (ntl)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Joint STATUS REPORT by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding the Filing of Consolidated Pleading and Responses to Consolidated Pleading by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel shall provide the Court with a joint status report on or before August 26, 2019. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/12/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS et al. (ntl)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re #26 MOTION to Seal filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/1/19. (ntl)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:19-md-2895 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00044-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS(rwc)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02895-LPS, 1:19-cv-00044-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS(rwc)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REDACTED VERSION of #25 Amended Complaint by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bifferato, Ian)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Ian Connor Bifferato regarding Publicly-Filed Version of UFCW Local 1500's Amended Complaint - re #25 Amended Complaint. (Bifferato, Ian)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund's Amended Complaint - filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bifferato, Ian)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 [SEALED] AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bifferato, Ian)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/18/19. (ntl)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brent Landau for UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Melinda R. Coolidge for UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Irving Scher for UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #22 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Scheduling Order Regarding Filing of Amended Complaint, Responses Thereto, and Phased Discovery filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/12/19. (ntl)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Ian Connor Bifferato regarding Enclosed Stipulation [Proposed] Scheduling Order Regarding Filing of Amended Complaint, Responses Thereto, and Phased Discovery - re #22 Stipulation. (Bifferato, Ian)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Scheduling Order Regarding Filing of Amended Complaint, Responses Thereto, and Phased Discovery by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Bifferato, Ian)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Henninger S. Bullock and Karen W. Lin for Actavis Pharma Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., and Watson Laboratories, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 APPENDIX of Unreported Authorities Cited in Brief in Support of Motion to Appoint Counsel by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Bifferato, Ian)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECLARATION re #19 Opening Brief in Support, #18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bifferato, Ian)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/28/2019. (Bifferato, Ian)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Bifferato, Ian)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Amended and Superseded First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to All Defendants filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.(Bifferato, Ian)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' recent letters (C.A. No. 19-369 D.I. 12, 13, 14; C.A. No. 19-369 D.I. 27, 28, 29), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for early, expedited discovery is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renew in connection with the proposed scheduling order to be filed in accordance with this Order. At this point, Plaintiffs have not met their burden to show "good cause" for discovery outside of the ordinary schedule imposed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. In particular, Plaintiffs fail to persuasively articulate how they are prejudiced if "prevent[ed]... from efficiently moving forward on the same footing and at the same pace" (C.A. No. 19-369 D.I. 12 at 3) as the plaintiff in Cipla, Ltd. v. Amgen, Inc., C.A. No. 19-44 ("Cipla Matter"). No request for preliminary injunctive relief is pending in these cases. (Such a motion is pending in the Cipla Matter. The Court currently anticipates resolving that motion by on or about May 3. Such resolution may impact the issues raised in the parties' letters in these cases.) Plaintiffs' request for broad early discovery is particularly disfavored and may be burdensome to Defendants (unlike, for example, a tailored request for discovery already produced in the Cipla Matter). The Court does not, however, agree with Defendants that discovery in these cases should necessarily await resolution of the matters pending before the Joint Panel on Multidistrict Litigation or any forthcoming motion to dismiss (although Defendants may renew these arguments in connection with the scheduling proposals to be submitted in accordance with this Order). Accordingly, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and (i) no later than fourteen (14) days from today determine a date for Defendants to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the complaint; (ii) no later than thirty (30) days from today, the parties shall conduct a Rule 26(f) conference; and (iii) and no later than forty-five (45) days from today, the parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order(s) (consistent with Judge Stark's form scheduling order). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the teleconference scheduled for tomorrow is CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/25/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS (ntl)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Henninger S. Bullock and Karen W. Lin - filed by Actavis Pharma Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (15 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Henninger S. Bullock and Karen W. Lin filed by Actavis Pharma Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; (30 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Henninger S. Bullock and Karen W. Lin filed by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis plc, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/25/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS (ntl)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Plaintiffs' April 22, 2019 Letter - re (12 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Letter, (27 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) Letter,. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen E. Keller - re (12 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Letter, (27 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Keller, Karen)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Ian Connor Bifferato and Tiffany J. Cramer on behalf of Plaintiffs in the referenced actions regarding Request for Production of Documents from Defendants - re 11 Order Setting Teleconference,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Bifferato, Ian)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for April 26, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than April 22, 2019, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than April 24, 2019, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/18/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS (ntl)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey S. Istvan, Adam J. Pessin, Paul Costa, and Roberta D. Liebenberg for UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 Stipulation and Order filed by Actavis Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/25/19. (ntl)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Actavis Inc.. (sar)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION Regarding Service of Process and Briefing Schedule by Actavis Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott A. Martin and Irving Scher of Hausfeld LLP filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/19/19. (ntl)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott A. Martin and Irving Scher of Hausfeld LLP - filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Weinberger, Ned)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Ian Connor Bifferato and Tiffany J. Cramer on behalf of all parties in the referenced actions regarding Request for the Scheduling of a Discovery Teleconference. (Bifferato, Ian)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents to Defendants filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.(Bifferato, Ian)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Karin E. Garvey,Matthew J. Perez for UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 Stipulation and Order filed by Amgen Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/11/19. (ntl)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jay L. Himes for UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gregory Asciolla for UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Status Conference held on 3/8/2019. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00044-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS (ntl)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robin A. van der Meulen for UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Amgen Inc.. (Egan, Brian)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory S. Asciolla, Jay L. Himes, Karin E. Garvey, Robin A. van der Meulen, Matthew J. Perez of Labaton Sucharow LLP; Brent Landau and Melinda R. Coolidge of Hausfeld LLP; and Roberta D. Liebenberg, Jeffre filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/6/19. (ntl)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORAL ORDER: Having received requests from Plaintiffs' counsel in C.A. Nos. 19-369 and 19-396 to appear at the status conference scheduled in 19-44 for Friday, March 8 at 12:00 p.m., and understanding that the parties to 19-44 evidently oppose these requests, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the requests are GRANTED. It will be helpful to the Court to have present on Friday all counsel who represent anyone interested in being heard as the Court considers how to proceed in these likely related matters. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/5/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00044-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-UNA (ntl)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory S. Asciolla, Jay L. Himes, Karin E. Garvey, Robin A. van der Meulen, Matthew J. Perez of Labaton Sucharow LLP; Brent Landau and Melinda R. Coolidge of Hausfeld LLP; and Roberta D. Liebenberg, Jeffrey S. Istvan, Paul Costa, Adam J. Pessin of Fine, Kaplan and Black, R.P.C. - filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Weinberger, Ned)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Ned Weinberger, Esq. regarding Requesting Permission to Appear at Status Conference. (Weinberger, Ned)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (bkb)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Actavis Inc. on 2/22/2019; Actavis Pharma Inc. on 2/22/2019; Amgen Inc. on 2/22/2019; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. on 2/22/2019; Watson Laboratories, Inc. on 2/22/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sar)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Actavis Inc., Actavis Pharma Inc., Amgen Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2575735.) - filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund v. Amgen Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Henninger S. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc.
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Henninger S. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amgen Inc.
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Henninger S. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Represented By: Ned C. Weinberger
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Istvan
Represented By: Karin E. Garvey
Represented By: Adam J. Pessin
Represented By: Jay L. Himes
Represented By: Paul Costa
Represented By: Gregory Asciolla
Represented By: Robin A. van der Meulen
Represented By: Roberta D. Liebenberg
Represented By: Matthew J. Perez
Represented By: Melinda R. Coolidge
Represented By: Irving Scher
Represented By: Brent Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?