Lizer v. TD Bank, (USA) National Association et al

Plaintiff: Rebekah Lizer
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and TD Bank, (USA) National Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv00389
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement as to TD Bank, (USA) National Association Only by Rebekah Lizer (Garibian, Antranig)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by TD Bank, (USA) National Association.(DeMott, Brian)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax only by Rebekah Lizer (Garibian, Antranig)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to April 26, 2019 filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/27/19. (ntl)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to April 26, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to April 8, 2019 filed by TD Bank, (USA) National Association. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/13/19. (ntl)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to April 8, 2019 - filed by TD Bank, (USA) National Association. (DeMott, Brian)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian V. DeMott on behalf of TD Bank, (USA) National Association (DeMott, Brian)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebekah Lizer. TD Bank, (USA) National Association served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebekah Lizer. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
March 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 26, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 2/26/2019; TD Bank, (USA) National Association on 2/26/2019. (Summons mailed to counsel's Philadelphia office) (nmg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, TD Bank, (USA) National Association - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2579701.) - filed by Rebekah Lizer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lizer v. TD Bank, (USA) National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank, (USA) National Association
Represented By: Brian V. DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Lizer
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?