Brown v. Verizon Wireless Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sara Brown
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Verizon Wireless Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00390
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement as to Verizon Wireless Inc. Only by Sara Brown (Garibian, Antranig)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax only by Sara Brown (Garibian, Antranig)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to April 26, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 4/26/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/26/2019. (dlw)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to April 26, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sara Brown. Verizon Wireless Inc. served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sara Brown. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
March 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 26, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 2/26/2019; Verizon Wireless Inc. on 2/26/2019. (Summons mailed to Philadelphia office per filing party's request). (lak)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Verizon Wireless Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2579719.) - filed by Sara Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Verizon Wireless Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Brown
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?