Capitol Hill Publishing Corp. v. Inform, Inc.

Plaintiff: Capitol Hill Publishing Corp.
Defendant: Inform, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00393
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Regarding Settlement and Administrative Closure of Case by Capitol Hill Publishing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter to Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark)(Nimeroff, Jami)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Complaint to April 3, 2019 filed by Capitol Hill Publishing Corp. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/2/19. (ntl)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Complaint to April 3, 2019 - filed by Capitol Hill Publishing Corp.. (Nimeroff, Jami)
March 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Capitol Hill Publishing Corp.. Inform, Inc. served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. (Nimeroff, Jami)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent CHM Holdings, LLC for Capitol Hill Publishing Corp. filed by Capitol Hill Publishing Corp.. (Nimeroff, Jami)
February 27, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Inform, Inc. on 2/27/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Inform, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2579922.) - filed by Capitol Hill Publishing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capitol Hill Publishing Corp. v. Inform, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Hill Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Jami B. Nimeroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inform, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?