Cesar Castillo, Inc. v. Amgen Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cesar Castillo, Inc.
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amgen Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis plc and Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00396
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' recent letters (C.A. No. 19-369 D.I. 12, 13, 14; C.A. No. 19-369 D.I. 27, 28, 29), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for early, expedited discovery is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renew in connection with the proposed scheduling order to be filed in accordance with this Order. At this point, Plaintiffs have not met their burden to show "good cause" for discovery outside of the ordinary schedule imposed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. In particular, Plaintiffs fail to persuasively articulate how they are prejudiced if "prevent[ed]... from efficiently moving forward on the same footing and at the same pace" (C.A. No. 19-369 D.I. 12 at 3) as the plaintiff in Cipla, Ltd. v. Amgen, Inc., C.A. No. 19-44 ("Cipla Matter"). No request for preliminary injunctive relief is pending in these cases. (Such a motion is pending in the Cipla Matter. The Court currently anticipates resolving that motion by on or about May 3. Such resolution may impact the issues raised in the parties' letters in these cases.) Plaintiffs' request for broad early discovery is particularly disfavored and may be burdensome to Defendants (unlike, for example, a tailored request for discovery already produced in the Cipla Matter). The Court does not, however, agree with Defendants that discovery in these cases should necessarily await resolution of the matters pending before the Joint Panel on Multidistrict Litigation or any forthcoming motion to dismiss (although Defendants may renew these arguments in connection with the scheduling proposals to be submitted in accordance with this Order). Accordingly, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and (i) no later than fourteen (14) days from today determine a date for Defendants to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the complaint; (ii) no later than thirty (30) days from today, the parties shall conduct a Rule 26(f) conference; and (iii) and no later than forty-five (45) days from today, the parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order(s) (consistent with Judge Stark's form scheduling order). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the teleconference scheduled for tomorrow is CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/25/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS (ntl)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (15 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Henninger S. Bullock and Karen W. Lin filed by Actavis Pharma Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; (30 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Henninger S. Bullock and Karen W. Lin filed by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis plc, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/25/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS (ntl)
April 25, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Henninger S. Bullock and Karen W. Lin - filed by Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis plc, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
April 24, 2019 Filing 29 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Plaintiffs' April 22, 2019 Letter - re (12 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Letter, (27 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) Letter,. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 24, 2019 Filing 28 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen E. Keller - re (12 in 1:19-cv-00369-LPS) Letter, (27 in 1:19-cv-00396-LPS) Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Keller, Karen)
April 22, 2019 Filing 27 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Ian Connor Bifferato and Tiffany J. Cramer on behalf of Plaintiffs in the referenced actions regarding Request for Production of Documents from Defendants - re 25 Order Setting Teleconference,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Cramer, Tiffany)
April 22, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Pro Hac Attorney Hugh Sandler by Cesar Castillo, Inc. (Cramer, Tiffany)
April 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Michelle C. Clerkin and Michael M. Buchman for Cesar Castillo, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for April 26, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than April 22, 2019, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than April 24, 2019, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/18/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS (ntl)
April 9, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Bradley J. Vettraino and Thomas M. Sobol for Cesar Castillo, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
April 5, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Linda P. Nussbaum, Hugh D. Sandler, and Bart D. Cohen for Cesar Castillo, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
April 4, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jayne A. Goldstein for Cesar Castillo, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bradley J. Vettraino filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., #23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas M. Sobol filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/1/19. (ntl)
March 28, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bradley J. Vettraino - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
March 28, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas M. Sobol - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michelle C. Clerkin filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., #21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael M. Buchman filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/27/19. (ntl)
March 26, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michelle C. Clerkin - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
March 26, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael M. Buchman - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #20 Stipulation and Order filed by Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/22/19. (ntl)
March 21, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Service of Process and Briefing Schedule by Actavis Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
March 19, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benjamin F. Johns for Cesar Castillo, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
March 14, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Donna M. Evans for Cesar Castillo, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
March 14, 2019 Filing 19 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Ian Connor Bifferato and Tiffany J. Cramer on behalf of all parties in the referenced actions regarding Request for the Scheduling of a Discovery Teleconference. (Cramer, Tiffany)
March 14, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Defendant Amgen Inc. filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc..(Cramer, Tiffany)
March 14, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sharon K. Robertson for Cesar Castillo, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jayne A. Goldstein filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sharon K. Robertson filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Benjamin F. Johns filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Linda P. Nussbaum filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Donna M. Evans filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bart D. Cohen filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc., #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Hugh Sandler filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/11/19. (ntl)
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Cramer, Tiffany)
March 11, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Cramer, Tiffany)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to a date to be determined subject to meet and confer filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/11/19. (ntl)
March 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Status Conference held on 3/8/2019. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00044-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-LPS (ntl)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to a date to be determined subject to meet and confer - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cramer, Tiffany)
March 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORAL ORDER: Having received requests from Plaintiffs' counsel in C.A. Nos. 19-369 and 19-396 to appear at the status conference scheduled in 19-44 for Friday, March 8 at 12:00 p.m., and understanding that the parties to 19-44 evidently oppose these requests, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the requests are GRANTED. It will be helpful to the Court to have present on Friday all counsel who represent anyone interested in being heard as the Court considers how to proceed in these likely related matters. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/5/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00044-LPS, 1:19-cv-00369-LPS, 1:19-cv-00396-UNA (ntl)
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Tiffany J. Cramer, Esquire regarding Requesting Permission to Appear at Status Conference. (Cramer, Tiffany)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. Amgen Inc. served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Cramer, Tiffany)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Cramer, Tiffany)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Cramer, Tiffany)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Donna M. Evans - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sharon K. Robertson - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Benjamin F. Johns - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jayne A. Goldstein - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Hugh Sandler - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bart D. Cohen - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Linda P. Nussbaum - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. (Cramer, Tiffany)
February 27, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Actavis Pharma, Inc. on 2/27/2019; Actavis plc on 2/27/2019; Amgen Inc. on 2/27/2019; Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd. on 2/27/2019; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. on 2/27/2019; Watson Laboratories, Inc. on 2/27/2019; Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 2/27/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis plc, Amgen Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2580068.) - filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cesar Castillo, Inc. v. Amgen Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amgen Inc.
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Castillo, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Joanne Cramer
Represented By: Robert J. Kriner, Jr.
Represented By: Scott M. Tucker
Represented By: Vera Gerrit Belger
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Bradley J. Vettraino
Represented By: Benjamin F. Johns
Represented By: Jayne A. Goldstein
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Represented By: Hugh D. Sandler
Represented By: Michelle C. Clerkin
Represented By: Bart D. Cohen
Represented By: Sharon K. Robertson
Represented By: Michael M. Buchman
Represented By: Donna M. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?