Price v. Versum Materials, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Brian Price
Defendant: Susan C. Schnabel, Versum Materials, Inc., Thomas J. Riordan, Alejandro D. Wolff, Dr. Yi Hyon Paik, Seifollah Ghasemi, Guillermo Novo and Jacques Croisetiere
Case Number: 1:2019cv00427
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Brian Price: For Thomas J. Riordan waiver sent on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Brian Price: For Susan C. Schnabel waiver sent on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Brian Price: For Seifollah Ghasemi waiver sent on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Brian Price: For Jacques Croisetiere waiver sent on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Brian Price: For Guillermo Novo waiver sent on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Brian Price: For Yi Hyon Paik waiver sent on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Brian Price: For Alejandro D. Wolff waiver sent on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Brian Price: For Versum Materials, Inc. waiver sent on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (5 in 1:19-cv-00427-LPS) (5 in 1:19-cv-00460-LPS) (5 in 1:19-cv-00472-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter E. Kazanoff, Craig S. Waldman, and Joshua Polster filed by Susan C. Schnabel, Guillermo Novo, Thomas J. Riordan, Alejandro D. Wolff, Seifollah Ghasemi, Yi Hyon Paik, Jacques Croisetiere, Versum Materials, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/19/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00472-LPS, 1:19-cv-00427-LPS, 1:19-cv-00460-LPS (ntl)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter E. Kazanoff, Craig S. Waldman, and Joshua Polster - filed by Jacques Croisetiere, Seifollah Ghasemi, Guillermo Novo, Yi Hyon Paik, Thomas J. Riordan, Susan C. Schnabel, Versum Materials, Inc., Alejandro D. Wolff. (Hill, Coleen)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Versum Materials, Inc.. (Hill, Coleen)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Coleen Werring Hill on behalf of Jacques Croisetiere, Seifollah Ghasemi, Guillermo Novo, Yi Hyon Paik, Thomas J. Riordan, Susan C. Schnabel, Versum Materials, Inc., Alejandro D. Wolff (Hill, Coleen)
March 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 1, 2019 No Summons Issued. (lak)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Jacques Croisetiere, Seifollah Ghasemi, Guillermo Novo, Yi Hyon Paik, Thomas J. Riordan, Susan C. Schnabel, Versum Materials, Inc., Alejandro D. Wolff - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2583441.) - filed by Brian Price. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Versum Materials, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan C. Schnabel
Represented By: Coleen Werring Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Versum Materials, Inc.
Represented By: Coleen Werring Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Riordan
Represented By: Coleen Werring Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro D. Wolff
Represented By: Coleen Werring Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Yi Hyon Paik
Represented By: Coleen Werring Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seifollah Ghasemi
Represented By: Coleen Werring Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guillermo Novo
Represented By: Coleen Werring Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacques Croisetiere
Represented By: Coleen Werring Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Price
Represented By: Michael D. Van Gorder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?