Winfield v. Eloxx Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: John Winfield
Defendant: Does 1-10, Barry Honig, Eloxx Pharmaceuticals, Inc., James Schmidt and David Rector
Case Number: 1:2019cv00447
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Eloxx Pharmaceuticals, Inc., David Rector, James Schmidt. (Gallagher, Kevin)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Notice Consent and Reference to a Dispositive Motion to a Magistrate Judge and Complaint served on Barry Honig on March 22, 2019, filed by John Winfield. (Saydah, Gilbert)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to May 22, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Eloxx Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 5/22/2019; David Rector answer due 5/22/2019; James Schmidt answer due 5/22/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/9/2019. (nms)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to May 22, 2019 - filed by Eloxx Pharmaceuticals, Inc., David Rector, James Schmidt. (Gallagher, Kevin)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Notice Consent and Reference to a Dispositive Motion to a Magistrate Judge and Complaint served on Eloxx Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on March 18, 2019, filed by John Winfield. (Saydah, Gilbert)
March 26, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael J. Maloney for John Winfield added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Maloney, filed by John Winfield. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2019. (nms)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Maloney - filed by John Winfield. (Saydah, Gilbert)
March 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 6, 2019 Remark: Summons with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Eloxx Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Barry Honig, David Rector, and James Schmidt mailed to Counsel's New York office. (ddp)
March 4, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Eloxx Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 3/5/2019; Barry Honig on 3/5/2019; David Rector on 3/5/2019; James Schmidt on 3/5/2019. (Mailed to Counsel's New York Office) Modified on 3/5/2019 (ddp).
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ddp)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Does 1-10, Eloxx Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Barry Honig, David Rector, and James Schmidt - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-25825079.) - filed by John Winfield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winfield v. Eloxx Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Honig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eloxx Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Michael Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Schmidt
Represented By: Kevin Michael Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rector
Represented By: Kevin Michael Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Winfield
Represented By: Gilbert Richard Saydah, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?