Kroll Information Assurance, LLC v. Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kroll Information Assurance, LLC
Defendant: Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00458
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 17, 2019 filed by Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/20/19. (ntl)
March 20, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alex C. Ussia and Charles Davant, IV for Kroll Information Assurance, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 17, 2019 - filed by Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc.. (Shannon, Kevin)
March 19, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney F. Greg Bowman for Kroll Information Assurance, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney F. Greg Bowman, Charles Davant IV, and Alex C. Ussia filed by Kroll Information Assurance, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/14/19. (ntl)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney F. Greg Bowman, Charles Davant IV, and Alex C. Ussia - filed by Kroll Information Assurance, LLC. (Ross, David)
March 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint, by Kroll Information Assurance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version - Exhibit A, #2 Redacted Version - Exhibit B, #3 Redacted Version - Exhibit C)(Ross, David)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting D.I. #1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint and Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/6/2019. (nmg)
March 5, 2019 Remark: Exit copies to Duty Judge (LPS). (nmg)
March 5, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc. on 3/5/2019. (nmg)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Kroll, LLC, Corporate Parent Duff & Phelps, LLC, Corporate Parent Deerfield Duff & Phelps, LLC, Corporate Parent Deerfield Dakota Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent Deerfield Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Deerfield MidCo Corporation, Corporate Parent Deerfield TopCo Corporation for Kroll Information Assurance, LLC filed by Kroll Information Assurance, LLC. (nmg)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed against Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX031455.) - filed by Kroll Information Assurance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint and Exhibits Under Seal - filed by Kroll Information Assurance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kroll Information Assurance, LLC v. Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kroll Information Assurance, LLC
Represented By: Adam Dylan Gold
Represented By: David Evan Ross
Represented By: Alex C. Ussia
Represented By: F. Greg Bowman
Represented By: Charles Davant, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin R. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?