Basten v. Capital One Bank (USA), National Association et al

Plaintiff: Margaret Basten
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Capital One Bank (USA), National Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv00468
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement as to Capital One Bank only by Margaret Basten (Garibian, Antranig)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to May 10, 2019 filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/15/19. (ntl)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to May 10, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret Basten. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret Basten. Capital One Bank (USA), National Association served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
March 15, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Summons mailed to Philadelphia office per filing party's request). (lak)
March 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 6, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Capital One Bank (USA), National Association on 3/6/2019; Equifax Information Services, LLC on 3/6/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (Mailed Summons to PLTF's counsel in Philadelphia) (sar)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Capital One Bank (USA), National Association, Equifax Information Services, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2587527.) - filed by Margaret Basten. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basten v. Capital One Bank (USA), National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Basten
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?