Mills v. Synchrony Bank et al

Plaintiff: Elitta Mills
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Synchrony Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv00470
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Elitta Mills: For Synchrony Bank waiver sent on 3/29/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to May 3, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 5/3/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/3/2019. (dlw)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to May 3, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elitta Mills. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
March 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 6, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 3/6/2019; Synchrony Bank on 3/6/2019. (Summons mailed to counsel's Philadelphia office) (nmg)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Synchrony Bank - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2587561.) - filed by Elitta Mills. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Synchrony Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elitta Mills
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?