Cannon v. The Breakers, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Michael Cannon
Defendant: The Breakers, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00537
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Defense counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 9/4/2019 at 10:00 AM Eastern time before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Prior to this date, counsel are to email their respective expert reports to this Magistrate Judge and her Judicial Administrator, Cathleen Kennedy. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/20/19. (cak)
June 5, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The discovery previously filed as D.I. 16 has been deleted per L.R. 5.4(b). (lih)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 6/20/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/4/19. (cak)
June 4, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (cak)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 6/28/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2019. Discovery due by 1/31/2020. Status Report due by 1/21/2020. A Status Conference is set for 1/28/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/17/2020. A Pretrial Conference is set for 6/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. A 2-day Jury Trial is set to begin on 7/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/4/2019. (lih)
June 4, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Scheduling Conference held on 6/4/2019. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lih)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Due to a conflict with the courts calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the rule 16 teleconference set in this matter for 11:30 AM is RESCHEDULED to 01:00 PM today before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/4/2019. (lih)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 Joint PROPOSED Scheduling Order by Michael Cannon. (Crumplar, David) Modified on 5/30/2019 (lih).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) is set for 6/4/2019 at 11:30 AM. Counsel for Plaintiff shall organize and initiate the teleconference to the Chambers of Sherry R. Fallon at 302-573-4557. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 5/30/2019. The Court's form scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/22/2019. (lih)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Michael Cannon, The Breakers, L.L.C. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/21/2019. (nmf)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Michael Cannon (Crumplar, David)
May 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Scheduling Conference held on 5/16/2019. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmf)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order re #7 Order Setting Scheduling Conference by Michael Cannon. (Crumplar, David)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Louis Mussman filed by Michael Cannon. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/25/2019. (fms)
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Louis Mussman - filed by Michael Cannon. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Louis Mussman, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Crumplar, David)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Crumplar on behalf of Michael Cannon (Crumplar, Thomas)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/16/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/17/2019. (nmf)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Arrington on behalf of The Breakers, L.L.C. (Arrington, Michael)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by The Breakers, L.L.C..(Battista, Elio)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elio Battista, Jr on behalf of The Breakers, L.L.C. (Battista, Elio)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Cannon. The Breakers, L.L.C. served on 3/21/2019, answer due 4/11/2019. (Crumplar, David)
March 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 19, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to The Breakers, L.L.C. on 3/19/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed against The Breakers, L.L.C. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2598551.) - filed by Michael Cannon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannon v. The Breakers, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Breakers, L.L.C.
Represented By: Elio Battista, Jr.
Represented By: Michael W. Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cannon
Represented By: David Thomas Crumplar
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?