McKinzie, Jr. v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Willie G. McKinzie, Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00542
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/5/2019. (nms)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 Transcript of Social Security Proceedings re #10 Transcript (Social Security Record),,, #9 Transcript (Social Security Record),,, #8 Answer to Complaint filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Medical Records Part 40, #2 Medical Records Part 41, #3 Medical Records Part 42, #4 Medical Records Part 43, #5 Medical Records Part 44, #6 Medical Records Part 45, #7 Medical Records Part 46, #8 Medical Records Part 47, #9 Medical Records Part 48, #10 Medical Records Part 49, #11 Medical Records Part 50, #12 Medical Records Part 51, #13 Medical Records Part 52, #14 Medical Records Part 53, #15 Medical Records Part 54, #16 Medical Records Part 55, #17 Medical Records Part 56, #18 Medical Records Part 57)(Benderson, Heather)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 Transcript of Social Security Proceedings re #9 Transcript (Social Security Record),,, #8 Answer to Complaint filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Medical Records Part 19, #2 Medical Records Part 20, #3 Medical Records Part 21, #4 Medical Records Part 22, #5 Medical Records Part 23, #6 Medical Records Part 24, #7 Medical Records Part 25, #8 Medical Records Part 26, #9 Medical Records Part 27, #10 Medical Records Part 28, #11 Medical Records Part 29, #12 Medical Records Part 30, #13 Medical Records Part 31, #14 Medical Records Part 32, #15 Medical Records Part 33, #16 Medical Records Part 34, #17 Medical Records Part 35, #18 Medical Records Part 36, #19 Medical Records Part 37, #20 Medical Records Part 38)(Benderson, Heather)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 Transcript of Social Security Proceedings re #8 Answer to Complaint filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Court Transcript Index, #2 Documents Related to Administrative Process, #3 Documents Related to Administrative Process, #4 Payment Documents, #5 Jurisdictional Documents, #6 Non-Disability Related, #7 Disability Related, #8 Medical Records Part 1, #9 Medical Records Part 2, #10 Medical Records Part 3, #11 Medical Records Part 4, #12 Medical Records Part 5, #13 Medical Records Part 7, #14 Medical Records Part 8, #15 Medical Records Part 9, #16 Medical Records Part 10, #17 Medical Records Part 11, #18 Medical Records Part 12, #19 Medical Records Part 13, #20 Medical Records Part 14, #21 Medical Records Part 15, #22 Medical Records Part 16, #23 Medical Records Part 17, #24 Medical Records Part 6)(Benderson, Heather)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Benderson, Heather)
April 23, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 8 has been removed from the docket as the incorrect filing event code was used. Counsel should refile the executed summons using the "Summons Returned Executed" event code. (nms)
April 17, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The summons returned executed at D.I. 5 for the Commissioner of Social Security has been removed from the docket as the incorrect filing event code was used. Counsel shall refile the summons using the "Returned Summons Executed as to USA," thereby allowing the correct answer date to be set. The docket text for D.I. #6 and D.I. #7 have also been amended to reflect the correct party being served. (nms)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie G. McKinzie, Jr.. United States Attorney for the District of Delaware served on 4/3/2019. (Hampton, Stephen) Modified on 4/17/2019 (nms).
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie G. McKinzie, Jr.. Attorney General of the United States served on 4/3/2019. (Hampton, Stephen) Modified on 4/17/2019 (nms).
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Benderson, Heather)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of David F. Chermol, Esq., filed by Willie G. McKinzie, Jr.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/27/2019. (nms)
March 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of David F. Chermol, Esq - filed by Willie G. McKinzie, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hampton, Stephen) Modified on 3/27/2019 (nms).
March 22, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed to filing party on 3/22/2019. (lak)
March 20, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, and Social Security Administration. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed against Commissioner of Social Security - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2599676.) - filed by Willie G. McKinzie, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinzie, Jr. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie G. McKinzie, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?