Katz v. Rittenhouse Organization, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bernard Katz
Defendant: Rittenhouse Organization, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00546
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Enforcement of Arbitration Provision filed by Rittenhouse Organization, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance Certificate of Service)(Anthony, David) Modified on 5/2/2019 (dlw).
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re D.I. #4 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Enforcement of Arbitration Provision. - filed by Bernard Katz. (lak)
April 18, 2019 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Enforcement of Arbitration Provision - Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/1/2019. ***Copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff 4/18/2019*** (dlw)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Enforcement of Arbitration Provision - filed by Rittenhouse Organization, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Compliance Certificate of Service)(Anthony, David)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bernard Katz. Rittenhouse Organization, Inc. served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (sar)
March 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 21, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Rittenhouse Organization, Inc. on 3/21/2019. (rwc)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against Rittenhouse Organization, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 031521.) - filed by Bernard Katz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Acknowledgement of Consent Form, #4 Acknowledgement of Rule 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katz v. Rittenhouse Organization, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rittenhouse Organization, Inc.
Represented By: David B. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?