Cox et al v. Carrier Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Doris Anne Cox and Harold E. Cox
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, Gardner Denver, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., General Electric Company, Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Crane Co., Carrier Corporation, CBS Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., Peerless Industries Inc., ITT Corporation and Bethlehem Steel Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00548
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of INITIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST filed by Doris Anne Cox, Harold E. Cox.(Medford, Ipek)
July 15, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the discovery previously filed as D.I. 50 per L.R. 5.4(b). (lih)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #49 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiff's production of bankruptcy trust claim forms to July 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/12/2019. (lih)
July 12, 2019 Filing 49 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiff's production of bankruptcy trust claim forms to July 29, 2019 - filed by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Texter, Allison)
June 4, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures served upon Loreto Rufo and Allison Texter on 6-4-19 by Doris Anne Cox, Harold E. Cox (Medford, Ipek)
June 4, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc..(Bradley, Paul)
June 3, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 47 has been deleted from the docket at the request of counsel. (dlw)
May 30, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant IMO Industries Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure filed by IMO Industries, Inc..(Ford, Eileen)
May 29, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Gardner Denver, Inc..(Donelson, Matthew)
May 29, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant, Carrier Corporation's Initial Disclosures Under Federal Rule of Procedure 26 filed by Carrier Corporation.(Tyler, Jessica)
May 29, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant, Warren Pumps, LLC's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Tyler, Jessica)
May 28, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Crane Co..(Gondek, Francis)
May 28, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by General Electric Company.(Texter, Allison)
May 28, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by CBS Corporation.(Texter, Allison)
May 28, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Texter, Allison)
May 24, 2019 Filing 38 STATUS REPORT regarding Bethlehem Steel Corporation by Doris Anne Cox, Harold E. Cox. (Medford, Ipek) Modified on 5/28/2019 (lih).
May 22, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Schneider Electric USA, Inc..(Glenn, Neal)
May 22, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The discovery previously filed as D.I. 37 has been deleted per L.R. 5.4(b). (lih)
May 22, 2019 Filing 36 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Square D Company, Other Affiliate Schneider Electric Industries SAS, Other Affiliate Schneider Electric Holding Amerique du Nord, Other Affiliate Schneider Electric SE for Schneider Electric USA, Inc. filed by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Glenn, Neal)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- On or before May 28, 2019, counsel shall submit a status report as to the status of defendant Bethlehem Steel Corp.. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/20/2019. (lih)
May 21, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Fallon for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (lih)
May 20, 2019 Remark: Party Bethlehem Steel Corp. added per D.I. #1 . (lih)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 7/25/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/25/2019. Discovery due by 4/17/2020. Status Report due by 5/13/2020. A Status Conference is set for 5/19/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Dispositive Motions due by 6/17/2020. (PLEASE REFER TO ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/20/2019. (lih)
May 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Scheduling Conference held on 5/20/2019. (Court Reporter S. Ingram (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
May 15, 2019 Filing 34 Joint PROPOSED Scheduling Order by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Texter, Allison) Modified on 5/15/2019 (lih).
May 15, 2019 Filing 33 Letter to U.S. Magistrate Judge S. R. Fallon from Allison Texter, Esq.; as Defense Liaison regarding Joint Proposed Scheduling Order. (Texter, Allison)
April 24, 2019 Filing 32 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Crane Co.. (Gondek, Francis)
April 24, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Crane Co.. (Skiles, Nicholas)
April 23, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen) Modified on 4/24/2019 (lih).
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on 5/20/2019 at 2:00 P.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall organize and initiate the teleconference to the Chambers of Sherry R. Fallon at 302-573-4557. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 5/15/2019. The Court's form asbestos scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/22/2019. (lih)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney LAURA LASZEWSKI, ESQ.. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/22/2019. (lih)
April 18, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney LAURA LASZEWSKI, ESQUIRE - filed by Doris Anne Cox, Harold E. Cox. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Medford, Ipek)
April 18, 2019 Filing 28 Status Report (Medford, Ipek) Modified on 4/18/2019 (lih).
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- DENYING without prejudice #24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney LAURA LASZEWSKI, Esq. for failure to submit the required $25.00 filing fee. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/18/2019. (lih)
April 15, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #26 has been modified to reflect that the document is a ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). It is requested that counsel use the ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) event code when filing documents of this nature in the future. (lih)
April 15, 2019 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Peerless Industries Inc.. (Picollelli, Nicholas)
April 15, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Peerless Industries Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Picollelli, Nicholas) Modified on 4/15/2019 (lih).
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael K. Atkins, Esquire. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/11/2019. (lih)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER- Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order: (1) Plaintiff(s) shall submit a statement to the Court that: (a) identifies those Defendants who have not yet been served with the Complaint; (b) identifies those Defendants who have been served with the Complaint but have not yet filed an Answer; (c) provides any reason why a Rule 16 conference should not occur within 30 days of the date of its submission; and (d) notes any other pending matters which require judicial action. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/11/2019. (lih)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thi Hoang Ho. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/10/2019. (lih)
April 9, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney LAURA LASZEWSKI, ESQUIRE - filed by Doris Anne Cox, Harold E. Cox. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Medford, Ipek)
April 9, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thi Hoang Ho - filed by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Ford, Eileen)
April 9, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of ITT Corporation (Costello, Kelly)
April 9, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Glenn, Neal)
April 9, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Donelson, Matthew)
April 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael K. Atkins, Esq. - filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order )Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 4/9/2019 (lih).
April 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lee Tyler on behalf of Carrier Corporation (Tyler, Jessica)
April 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lee Tyler on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Tyler, Jessica)
April 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of CROSS-NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE ORAL & VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF HAROLD E. COX FOR USE AT TRIAL by Doris Anne Cox, Harold E. Cox (Medford, Ipek)
April 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of SOCIAL SECURITY RECORDS AND MILITARY RECORDS filed by Doris Anne Cox, Harold E. Cox.(Medford, Ipek)
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent CLFX, LLC for IMO Industries, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc. filed by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen)
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Ford, Eileen)
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff, Harold Cox on Wednesday, April 10, 2019 filed by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Texter, Allison)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal C. Glenn on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Glenn, Neal)
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AB Electrolux for Electrolux Home Products, Inc. filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Bradley, Paul)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Electrolux Home Products, Inc..(Bradley, Paul)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Bradley on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Bradley, Paul)
March 27, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (nmg)
March 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Goulds Pumps, LLC (Costello, Kelly)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate General Electric Capital Corporation, Other Affiliate Universal City Development Partners, LTD, Other Affiliate ValueVision Media, Inc, Other Affiliate General Electric Capital Services, Inc., Other Affiliate NBC Universal Media, LLC (a/k/a NBC Universal); for General Electric Company filed by General Electric Company. (Valocchi, Beth)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal by CBS Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth E. Valocchi on behalf of CBS Corporation (Valocchi, Beth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group plc (Scotland) for Foster Wheeler LLC filed by Foster Wheeler LLC. (nmg)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N19C-02-188 ASB (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2600750)- filed by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox et al v. Carrier Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Antoinette D. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Ana Marina McCann
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Francis C. Gondek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Ana Marina McCann
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Industries Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas D. Picollelli, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethlehem Steel Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Anne Cox
Represented By: Adam Balick
Represented By: Ipek Kurul Medford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold E. Cox
Represented By: Adam Balick
Represented By: Ipek Kurul Medford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?