Hartford Fire Insurance Company v. Iron Locust-Grove, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Iron Locust-Grove, LLC and Timothy McKenna
Case Number: 1:2019cv00555
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Counsel to Plaintiff Hartford Fire Insurance Company regarding Status of matters - re 7 Oral Order,. (Primack, David)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORAL ORDER: Defendant Timothy McKenna's answer was due to be filed on 7/5/2019 (see D.I. #4 ), and to date none has been filed. Now the Plaintiff shall file a status letter within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/12/2019. (nms)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Process. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/17/2019. (nms)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Process - filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Primack, David) Modified on 6/17/2019 (nms).
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Timothy McKenna served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Primack, David)
June 5, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Iron Locust-Grove, LLC, Timothy McKenna. (lak)
May 15, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Iron Locust-Grove, LLC, Timothy McKenna. (sar)
May 15, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The summons attached to D.I. 3 have been removed from that filing. Summons are not to be docketed but presented to the Clerk's Office for issuance. (nms)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 First Amended Complaint against Iron Locust-Grove, LLC and Timothy McKenna - filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Primack, David) Modified on 5/15/2019 (nms).
March 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 22, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Iron Locust-Grove, LLC on 3/22/2019; Timothy McKenna on 3/22/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed against Iron Locust-Grove, LLC, Timothy McKenna - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2601694.) - filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Fire Insurance Company v. Iron Locust-Grove, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: David Phillip Primack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iron Locust-Grove, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?