Liles v. Proctor and Gamble Company et al
Plaintiff: Danny Liles
Defendant: Astra Zeneca Manufacturing Co. and Proctor and Gamble Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00565
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 24 Letter to Honorable Judge Maryellen Noreika from Danny Liles, dated 7/2/2019 regarding supplemental in support of Complaint - re D.I. #3 Complaint,. (myr)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, motion for declaratory judgment, and motion for reconsideration are DENIED as moot. (D.I. #13 , #14 , #21 . The Complaint is DISMISSED as legally frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). Amendment is futile. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case (copy to pltf.) (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/27/2019. (nmg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/27/2019. (nmg)
June 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Reconsideration re #10 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment - filed by Danny Liles. (amf)
June 14, 2019 Filing 20 [SEALED] Medical Records - re #3 Complaint, filed by Danny Liles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(amf)
May 28, 2019 Filing 19 Letter to Danny Liles from Clerk's Office regarding Status update and copywork request. (One free docket sheet included). (lak)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 Letter to Clerk's Office from Danny Liles regarding Status update and copywork request. (lak)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 [SEALED] Medical Records re: #3 Complaint, by Danny Liles. (lak)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Judge Maryellen Noreika from Danny Liles regarding Proposed Settlement. (myr) Modified on 6/25/2019 (myr).
May 3, 2019 Remark: D.I. #9 being resent to Danny Liles with inmate number. (amf)
May 2, 2019 Filing 15 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Danny Liles (D.I. #9 ) for lack of inmate number. (amf)
April 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment - filed by Danny Liles. (myr)
April 17, 2019 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Danny Liles. (nmg)
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 Letter to Judge Noreika from Danny Liles regarding update. (lak)
April 10, 2019 Filing 11 Second Authorization by Danny Liles requesting Prison Business Office to disburse payments to the Clerk of the Court. (copy of assessment order and authorization to Prison Business Office). (lak)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (D.I. #8 ) is DENIED as premature. Plaintiff may re-file his Motion for Summary Judgment at an appropriate time. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/10/2019. (lak)
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to Danny Liles from Clerk of Court responding to request for copy work attached to D.I. #8 Motion for Summary Judgment (*courtesy copy of docket sheet enclosed). (ceg)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Danny Liles. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(ceg)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to Clerk of Court from Danny Liles, dated 4/3/2019, regarding the filing fee. (ceg)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 Authorization filed by Danny Liles requesting Prison Business Office to disburse payments to the Clerk of the Court (*copy of assessment order and authorization to Prison Business Office). (ceg) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/9/2019) (ceg).
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. An initial partial filing fee of $31.60 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form)( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 4/29/2019.). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/29/19. (sar)
March 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ddp)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT of Injuries Suffered from the Use of Dangerous and Harmful Products of the Defendant(s) filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against Astra Zeneca Manufacturing Co., Proctor and Gamble Company - filed by Danny Liles. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddp)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 Trust Fund Account Statement by Danny Liles (ddp) Modified on 3/26/2019 (ddp).
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Danny Liles. (ddp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liles v. Proctor and Gamble Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astra Zeneca Manufacturing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proctor and Gamble Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Liles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?