Clark v. Johnson and Johnson Company et al

Plaintiff: Tylir Clark
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Johnson and Johnson Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00587
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 Authorization by Tylir Clark requesting Prison Business Office to disburse payments to the Clerk of the Court - dated 5/16/2019. (copy of assessment order and authorization to Prison Business Office) (amf)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Motion to Proceed IFP. An initial partial filing fee of $22.90 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form) (*Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/13/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/13/2019. (ceg)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Tylir Clark. (amf)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 Trust Fund Account Statement submitted by Tylir Clark. (amf)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Tylir Clark. (sar)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. Plaintiff shall submit IFP application and trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form) Notice of Compliance deadline set for 5/6/2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/4/2019. (lak)
April 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Johnson and Johnson Company (No Fee Paid, No IFP) - filed by Tylir Clark. (nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Johnson and Johnson Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tylir Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?