Bennett et al v. 3M Company et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Rust, Todd Evans, Tamall Spurlock, Merriella McMilian, Brandon Miller, Jason Cutillo, Benjamin Palumbo and Francis Bennett
Defendant: Aearo Technologies, LLC and 3M Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00590
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Remark : Case transferred from Delaware has been opened in Northern District of Florida as case 3:19-cv-00598, filed 04/15/2019. (rwc)
April 15, 2019 Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Florida (MDL No. 2885). (fms)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) MDL No. 2885 by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Northern District of Florida and, with the consent of that court, assigning the case to the Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. (fms)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to June 17, 2019 and to RESPOND to Motion to Remand to June 11, 2019 filed by 3M Company. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: 3M Company answer due 6/17/2019; Aearo Technologies, LLC answer due 6/17/2019. Set Briefing Schedule: re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Answering Brief due 6/11/2019.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/5/2019. (fms)
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to June 17, 2019 and to RESPOND to Motion to Remand to June 11, 2019 - filed by 3M Company. (Larson, William)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Consent to Removal and Notice of Joinder by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Larson, William)
April 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by 3M Company. (Larson, William)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William Bruce Larson, Jr on behalf of 3M Company (Larson, William)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Francis Bennett, Jason Cutillo, Todd Evans, Merriella McMilian, Brandon Miller, Benjamin Palumbo, Christopher Rust, Tamall Spurlock re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Warner, Raeann)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION re #4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Remand (Amended Rule 7.1.1 Statement) by Francis Bennett, Jason Cutillo, Todd Evans, Merriella McMilian, Brandon Miller, Benjamin Palumbo, Christopher Rust, Tamall Spurlock. (Gallagher, Patrick)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court - filed by Francis Bennett, Jason Cutillo, Todd Evans, Merriella McMilian, Brandon Miller, Benjamin Palumbo, Christopher Rust, Tamall Spurlock. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1.1 Statement)(Gallagher, Patrick)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Remand - filed by Francis Bennett, Jason Cutillo, Todd Evans, Merriella McMilian, Brandon Miller, Benjamin Palumbo, Christopher Rust, Tamall Spurlock. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1.1 Statement, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit)(Gallagher, Patrick)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Aearo LLC, Corporate Parent Aearo Intermediate LLC, Corporate Parent Aearo Holding LLC, Corporate Parent 3M Occupational Safety LLC for Aearo Technologies, LLC; Corporate Parent 3M Occupational Safety LLC for 3M Company filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Stemerman, Jonathan)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number K19C-02-032 WLW (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2606396)- filed by Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Rust
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Gallagher
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Evans
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Gallagher
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamall Spurlock
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Gallagher
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merriella McMilian
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Gallagher
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Miller
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Gallagher
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Cutillo
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Gallagher
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Palumbo
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Gallagher
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Bennett
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Gallagher
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan M. Stemerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Jonathan M. Stemerman
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: William Bruce Larson, Jr.
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?