In re: Alcor Energy, LLC et al.
Appellant: Alcor Energy Solutions LLC and Barry Stonehouse
Appellee: B&B Holdings Limited, Bruce Jorgensen and Alcor Energy, LLC
Debtor: Alcor Energy, LLC et al.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00597
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 REDACTED VERSION of #11 Appendix, by Alcor Energy Solutions LLC, Barry Stonehouse. (Liu, Zhao) Modified on 6/27/2019 (nms).
June 27, 2019 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #11 . (nms)
June 24, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The appendix filed at D.I. 13 has been removed from the docket. This filing appeared to be a redacted version of a previously filed sealed document. Counsel shall refile the redacted document using the correct filing event code. (nms)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Opening Brief and Appendix (D.I. #10 , D.I. #11 ), by Alcor Energy Solutions LLC, Barry Stonehouse. (Liu, Zhao) Modified on 6/18/2019 (nms).
June 18, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text for D.I. 10 has been corrected to reflect the filing is Appellants' Brief, and the Answering Brief due date set has been removed. Counsel is reminded to use the correct filing event codes. (nms)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 [SEALED] APPENDIX re #10 Appellants' Brief, by Alcor Energy Solutions LLC, Barry Stonehouse. (Liu, Zhao) Modified on 6/18/2019 (nms).
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 Appellants' Brief, filed by Alcor Energy Solutions LLC, Barry Stonehouse. (Liu, Zhao) Modified on 6/18/2019 (nms).
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SO ORDERED, re #8 Stipulation and Order Setting Briefing Schedule (*Set Deadlines: Appellants' Brief due by 6/17/2019, Appellee's Brief due by 8/1/2019, Appellants' Reply Brief due by 8/16/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/2/2019. (nms)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Setting Briefing Schedule, by Alcor Energy Solutions LLC, Barry Stonehouse. (Liu, Zhao) Modified on 5/2/2019 (nms).
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Additional Items to be Included in the Record, filed by Alcor Energy, LLC. (Edwards, Erin) Modified on 4/26/2019 (nms).
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SO ORDERED Granting #5 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. The parties are to submit a proposed briefing schedule within one week. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/25/2019. (nms)
April 25, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Recommendation at DI 5 was replaced with a corrected copy. (cak)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/25/19. (cak) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/25/2019) (cak).
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Designation of Record and Statement of Issues on Appeal Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a), filed by Alcor Energy Solutions LLC, Barry Stonehouse. (Liu, Zhao) Modified on 4/15/2019 (nms).
April 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
April 3, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The transmittal in D.I. #1 and the notice of docketing at D.I. #2 have been replaced to reflect the correct appellee in the case. (sar) Modified on 4/4/2019 (nms).
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Friday, April 12, 2019, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/29/19. (cak)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (sar) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/3/2019) (sar).
March 29, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (sar)
March 29, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (sar)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 3/20/19 by Judge Christopher S. Sontchi in Bankruptcy case number 18-12839. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Alcor Energy Solutions LLC, Barry Stonehouse. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Amended Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(sar) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/3/2019) (sar).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Alcor Energy, LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Alcor Energy Solutions LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Waxman
Represented By: Eric John Monzo
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Represented By: Zhao Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Barry Stonehouse
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Waxman
Represented By: Eric John Monzo
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Represented By: Zhao Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: B&B Holdings Limited
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Waxman
Represented By: Eric John Monzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bruce Jorgensen
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Waxman
Represented By: Eric John Monzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alcor Energy, LLC
Represented By: Erin Edwards
Represented By: Ian J. Bambrick
Represented By: M. Blake Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Alcor Energy, LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?