In re TrueCar, Inc. Shareholder Derivative Litigation

Plaintiff: Ara Afarian and Shelley Niemi
Defendant: John Pierantoni, Ion Yadigaroglu, John Mendel, Christopher Claus, Erin Lantz, Robert Bruce, Wesley Nichols, John Krafcik, Steven Dietz, Michael Guthrie, The United States Automobile Association, Abhishek Agrawal, Victor Perry and Robert Buce
Nominal Defendant: TrueCar, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00617
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re #31 Notice and Order of Dismissal of Shelley Niemi as a Plaintiff Against Defendants. Party Shelley Niemi (derivatively on behalf of TrueCar, Inc. ) terminated. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/6/2019. (fms)
June 5, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Proposed Order of Dismissal of Shelley Niemi as a Plaintiff Against Defendants by Ara Afarian, Shelley Niemi (Bennett, Blake)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING ACTION. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/23/2019. (fms)
May 22, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION Staying Action by Abhishek Agrawal, Robert Buce, Christopher Claus, Steven Dietz, Michael Guthrie, John Krafcik, Erin Lantz, John Mendel, Wesley Nichols, Victor Perry, John Pierantoni, TrueCar, Inc., Ion Yadigaroglu. (German, Shannon)
May 22, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, #23 Notice (Other), filed by Ara Afarian, Shelley Niemi.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/29/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
May 8, 2019 Filing 27 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #24 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, #23 Notice (Other), filed by Abhishek Agrawal, Robert Buce, Christopher Claus, Steven Dietz, Michael Guthrie, John Krafcik, Erin Lantz, John Mendel, Wesley Nichols, Victor Perry, John Pierantoni, TrueCar, Inc., Ion Yadigaroglu.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/22/2019. (German, Shannon)
May 8, 2019 Filing 26 STATEMENT re #24 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, #23 Notice (Other), , #25 Proposed Order, by Abhishek Agrawal, Robert Buce, Christopher Claus, Steven Dietz, Michael Guthrie, John Krafcik, Erin Lantz, John Mendel, Wesley Nichols, Victor Perry, John Pierantoni, TrueCar, Inc., Ion Yadigaroglu. (German, Shannon)
May 8, 2019 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER Staying Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL No. 2900 re #24 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, #23 Notice (Other), by Abhishek Agrawal, Robert Buce, Christopher Claus, Steven Dietz, Michael Guthrie, John Krafcik, Erin Lantz, John Mendel, Wesley Nichols, Victor Perry, John Pierantoni, TrueCar, Inc., Ion Yadigaroglu. (German, Shannon)
May 8, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, #23 Notice (Other), - filed by Abhishek Agrawal, Robert Buce, Christopher Claus, Steven Dietz, Michael Guthrie, John Krafcik, Erin Lantz, John Mendel, Wesley Nichols, Victor Perry, John Pierantoni, TrueCar, Inc., Ion Yadigaroglu. (German, Shannon)
May 7, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Petition to the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation by Abhishek Agrawal, Robert Buce, Christopher Claus, Steven Dietz, Michael Guthrie, John Krafcik, Erin Lantz, John Mendel, Wesley Nichols, Victor Perry, John Pierantoni, TrueCar, Inc., Ion Yadigaroglu (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Transfer of Actions to the District of Delaware and for Consolidation Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407, #2 Exhibit Amended Certificate of Service)(German, Shannon)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to June 3, 2019 filed by Victor Perry, Steven Dietz, Ion Yadigaroglu, Robert Buce, John Pierantoni, John Krafcik, Christopher Claus, TrueCar, Inc., Michael Guthrie, John Mendel, Wesley Nichols, Erin Lantz, Abhishek Agrawal, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Abhishek Agrawal answer due 6/3/2019; Robert Buce answer due 6/3/2019; Christopher Claus answer due 6/3/2019; Steven Dietz answer due 6/3/2019; Michael Guthrie answer due 6/3/2019; John Krafcik answer due 6/3/2019; Erin Lantz answer due 6/3/2019; John Mendel answer due 6/3/2019; Wesley Nichols answer due 6/3/2019; Victor Perry answer due 6/3/2019; John Pierantoni answer due 6/3/2019; Ion Yadigaroglu answer due 6/3/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/18/2019. (nmf)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER approving STIPULATION to Consolidate Related Derivative Actions and Appoint Lead and Liasion Counsel re (3 in 1:19-cv-00625-CFC, 16 in 1:19-cv-00617-CFC) Stipulation filed by Ara Afarian, Shelley Niemi. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/17/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00617-CFC, 1:19-cv-00625-CFC(nmf)
April 16, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to June 3, 2019 - filed by Abhishek Agrawal, Robert Buce, Christopher Claus, Steven Dietz, Michael Guthrie, John Krafcik, Erin Lantz, John Mendel, Wesley Nichols, Victor Perry, John Pierantoni, TrueCar, Inc., Ion Yadigaroglu. (German, Shannon)
April 15, 2019 Filing 20 STATEMENT re #16 Stipulation by Abhishek Agrawal, Robert Buce, Christopher Claus, Steven Dietz, Michael Guthrie, John Krafcik, Erin Lantz, John Mendel, Wesley Nichols, Victor Perry, John Pierantoni, TrueCar, Inc., Ion Yadigaroglu. (German, Shannon)
April 12, 2019 Corporate Affiliates/Parents added per Disclosure Statement: identifying Other Affiliate Argonaut Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Great American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Old Republic Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate XL Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Liberty International Underwriters, Other Affiliate Allied World Assurance Company, Other Affiliate Berkley Professional Liability, Other Affiliate Chubb, Other Affiliate Travelers Bond & Specialty Insurance for TrueCar, Inc.. (fms)
April 11, 2019 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by TrueCar, Inc.. (German, Shannon)
April 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Elizabeth German on behalf of Abhishek Agrawal, Robert Buce, Christopher Claus, Steven Dietz, Michael Guthrie, John Krafcik, Erin Lantz, John Mendel, Wesley Nichols, Victor Perry, John Pierantoni, TrueCar, Inc., Ion Yadigaroglu (German, Shannon)
April 11, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Stipulation to Consolidate Related Derivative Actions and Appoint Lead and Liasion Counsel re (3 in 1:19-cv-00625-CFC, 16 in 1:19-cv-00617-CFC) Stipulation by Ara Afarian, Shelley Niemi. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bennett, Blake)
April 11, 2019 DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to re #16 Stipulation. The Stipulation lacks a proposed order. (fms)
April 10, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION Consolidate Related Derivative Actions and Appoint Lead and Liasion Counsel re (1 in 1:19-cv-00617-CFC) Complaint, (1 in 1:19-cv-00625-CFC) Complaint, by Ara Afarian, Shelley Niemi. (Bennett, Blake)
April 10, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Removed Stipulation for Consolidation in this case and related unassigned case per request of filer, to be refiled later. (rwc)
April 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 3, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ara Afarian. Michael Guthrie served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
April 3, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ara Afarian. John Krafcik served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
April 3, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ara Afarian. Erin Lantz served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ara Afarian. Abhishek Agrawal served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ara Afarian. Robert Buce served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Bennett, Blake) Modified on 4/3/2019 (ddp).
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ara Afarian. Christopher Claus served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ara Afarian. Steven Dietz served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ara Afarian. John Mendel served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ara Afarian. Victor Perry served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ara Afarian. Ion Yadigaroglu served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ara Afarian. John Pierantoni served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ara Afarian. Wesley Nichols served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ara Afarian. TrueCar, Inc. served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Bennett, Blake)
April 2, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Abhishek Agrawal on 4/2/2019; Robert Buce on 4/2/2019; Christopher Claus on 4/2/2019; Steven Dietz on 4/2/2019; Michael Guthrie on 4/2/2019; John Krafcik on 4/2/2019; Erin Lantz on 4/2/2019; John Mendel on 4/2/2019; Wesley Nichols on 4/2/2019; Victor Perry on 4/2/2019; John Pierantoni on 4/2/2019; The United States Automobile Association on 4/2/2019; TrueCar, Inc. on 4/2/2019; Ion Yadigaroglu on 4/2/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak) Modified on 4/3/2019 (ddp).
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Abhishek Agrawal, Robert Bruce, Christopher Claus, Steven Dietz, Michael Guthrie, John Krafcik, Erin Lantz, John Mendel, Wesley Nichols, Victor Perry, John Pierantoni, The United States Automobile Association, TrueCar, Inc., Ion Yadigaroglu - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2608847.) - filed by Ara Afarian. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re TrueCar, Inc. Shareholder Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: TrueCar, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pierantoni
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ion Yadigaroglu
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mendel
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Claus
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Lantz
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Nichols
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Krafcik
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Dietz
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Guthrie
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Automobile Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abhishek Agrawal
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Perry
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Buce
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ara Afarian
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Niemi
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?