Niemi v. Perry et al

Plaintiff: Shelley Niemi
Defendant: John Pierantoni, Ion Yadigaroglu, Christopher Claus, Erin Lantz, Robert Buce, John Mendel, United States Automobile Association, Wesley Nichols, John Krafcik, Steven Dietz, Michael Guthrie, Abhishek Agrawal and Victor Perry
Nominal Defendant: TrueCar, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00625
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Remark: D.I. #8 Stipulation to extend time to answer has been terminated as moot as it was "So Ordered" in Lead Case No. 19-617-CFC. Defendants should file their answers to this complaint in the lead case as all future filings are to be filed in the lead case only per the Order of Consolidation. (nmf)
April 18, 2019 Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:19-cv-00617-CFC. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 19-617-CFC. (nmf)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving STIPULATION to Consolidate Related Derivative Actions and Appoint Lead and Liasion Counsel re (3 in 1:19-cv-00625-CFC, 16 in 1:19-cv-00617-CFC) Stipulation filed by Ara Afarian, Shelley Niemi. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/17/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00617-CFC, 1:19-cv-00625-CFC(nmf)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to June 3, 2019 - filed by Abhishek Agrawal, Robert Buce, Christopher Claus, Steven Dietz, Michael Guthrie, John Krafcik, Erin Lantz, John Mendel, Wesley Nichols, Victor Perry, John Pierantoni, TrueCar, Inc., Ion Yadigaroglu. (German, Shannon)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT re #3 Stipulation by Abhishek Agrawal, Robert Buce, Christopher Claus, Steven Dietz, Michael Guthrie, John Krafcik, Erin Lantz, John Mendel, Wesley Nichols, Victor Perry, John Pierantoni, TrueCar, Inc., Ion Yadigaroglu. (German, Shannon)
April 12, 2019 Corporate Affiliates/Parents added per Disclosure Statement: identifying Other Affiliate Argonaut Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Great American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Old Republic Insurance Company, Other Affiliate XL Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Liberty International Underwriters, Other Affiliate Allied World Assurance Company, Other Affiliate Berkley Professional Liability, Other Affiliate Chubb, Other Affiliate Travelers Bond & Specialty Insurance for TrueCar, Inc.. (fms)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by TrueCar, Inc.. (German, Shannon)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Elizabeth German on behalf of Abhishek Agrawal, Robert Buce, Christopher Claus, Steven Dietz, Michael Guthrie, John Krafcik, Erin Lantz, John Mendel, Wesley Nichols, Victor Perry, John Pierantoni, TrueCar, Inc., Ion Yadigaroglu (German, Shannon)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Stipulation to Consolidate Related Derivative Actions and Appoint Lead and Liasion Counsel re (3 in 1:19-cv-00625-CFC, 16 in 1:19-cv-00617-CFC) Stipulation by Ara Afarian, Shelley Niemi. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bennett, Blake)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION Consolidate Related Derivative Actions and Appoint Lead and Liasion Counsel re (1 in 1:19-cv-00617-CFC) Complaint, (1 in 1:19-cv-00625-CFC) Complaint, by Ara Afarian, Shelley Niemi. (Bennett, Blake)
April 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
April 4, 2019 No Summons Issued. (nmg)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Abhishek Agrawal, Robert Buce, Christopher Claus, Steven Dietz, Michael Guthrie, John Krafcik, Erin Lantz, John Mendel, Wesley Nichols, Victor Perry, John Pierantoni, TrueCar, Inc., United States Automobile Association, Ion Yadigaroglu - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2610428.) - filed by Shelley Niemi. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Niemi v. Perry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: TrueCar, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pierantoni
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ion Yadigaroglu
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Claus
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Lantz
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Buce
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mendel
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Automobile Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Nichols
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Krafcik
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Dietz
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Guthrie
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abhishek Agrawal
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Perry
Represented By: Jessica A. Hartwell
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Niemi
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?