Bausch Health Ireland Limited et al v. Lupin Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Bausch Health Ireland Limited, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Norgine B.V.
Defendant: Lupin Ltd., Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00626
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA on 7/1/2019; Lupin Inc. on 7/1/2019; Lupin Ltd. on 7/1/2019; Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 7/1/2019. (nmg)
April 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
April 4, 2019 No Summons Issued. (nmg)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Norgine Europe B.V. for Norgine B.V. filed by Norgine B.V.. (nmg)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Bausch Health Companies Inc. for Bausch Health Ireland Limited, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Bausch Health Ireland Limited, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (nmg)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,999,313 B2 ;9,326,969 B2 ;9,592,252 B2 ;9,707,297 B2 ;10,016,504 B2. (nmg)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 2/19/2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 8/19/2021. (nmg)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2610661.) - filed by Bausch Health Ireland Limited, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Norgine B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bausch Health Ireland Limited et al v. Lupin Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bausch Health Ireland Limited
Represented By: Christopher Viceconte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Viceconte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norgine B.V.
Represented By: Christopher Viceconte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?