O'Neal v. TD Bank,National Association et al

Plaintiff: Alex O'Neal
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and TD Bank, National Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv00670
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC only by Alex O'Neal (Garibian, Antranig)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement as to TD Bank, (USA) National Association Only by Alex O'Neal (Garibian, Antranig)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to June 7, 2019 filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 6/7/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/8/2019. (fms)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to June 7, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 Stipulation filed by TD Bank, National Association, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: TD Bank, National Association answer due 6/13/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/2/2019. (fms)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Enlarge Time to File Answer to June 13, 2019 by TD Bank, National Association. (Nwaeze, Oderah)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Oderah C. Nwaeze on behalf of TD Bank, National Association (Nwaeze, Oderah)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alex O'Neal. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alex O'Neal. TD Bank, National Association served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
April 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 11, 2019 Remark : Summons mailed to Philadelphia Office per filing party's request. (myr)
April 11, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 4/11/2019; TD Bank, National Association on 4/11/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr) Modified on 4/11/2019 (myr).
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR CONSUMER CREDIT filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, and TD Bank, National Association, - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2617246.) - filed by Alex O'Neal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) Modified on 4/11/2019 (myr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neal v. TD Bank,National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank, National Association
Represented By: Oderah C. Nwaeze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex O'Neal
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?