Fleischman v. Verizon Wireless, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Celia Fleischman
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Verizon Wireless, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00671
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Celia Fleischman as to Equifax Information Services, LLC Only (Garibian, Antranig)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Celia Fleischman as to Verizon Wireless, Inc. Only (Garibian, Antranig)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Hunter, Travis)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement as to Verizon Wireless Inc. Only by Celia Fleischman (Garibian, Antranig)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC only by Celia Fleischman (Garibian, Antranig)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to June 7, 2019 filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/8/19. (ntl)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to June 7, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trans Union, LLC.(Bennett, Blake)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to through and including June 7, 2019 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/1/19. (ntl)
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to through and including June 7, 2019 - filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis)
April 29, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Terri R. Brown for Trans Union, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Terri R. Brown filed by Trans Union, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/25/19. (ntl)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Terri R. Brown - filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Bennett, Blake)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Bennett, Blake)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Celia Fleischman. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Celia Fleischman. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Celia Fleischman. Verizon Wireless, Inc. served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Celia Fleischman. Trans Union, LLC served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
April 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 11, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC; Experian Information Solutions, Inc.; Trans Union, LLC; and Verizon Wireless, Inc. on 4/11/2019. (*Summons mailed to counsel's Philadelphia office.) (amf)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, and Verizon Wireless, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2617257.) - filed by Celia Fleischman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleischman v. Verizon Wireless, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Represented By: Terri R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celia Fleischman
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?