Perez v. Verizon Wireless et al

Plaintiff: Juan Perez and Juan Carlos Perez
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Verizon Wireless
Case Number: 1:2019cv00673
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement as to Verizon Wireless Only by Juan Perez (Garibian, Antranig)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC only by Juan Perez (Garibian, Antranig)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to June 7, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 6/7/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/8/2019. (dlw)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer Complaint to June 7, 2019 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Perez. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Perez. Verizon Wireless served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Garibian, Antranig)
April 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 11, 2019 Remark : Summons mailed to Philadelphia Office per filing party's request. (myr)
April 11, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 4/11/2019; Verizon Wireless on 4/11/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CONSUMER CREDIT filed with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, and Verizon Wireless - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2617273.) - filed by Juan Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) Modified on 4/11/2019 (myr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Verizon Wireless et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Perez
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Perez
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Karen M. Grivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?