Chupany v. Stroup et al

Plaintiff: Melvin A. Chupany
Defendant: Savage Services Corporation and Lee A. Stroup
Case Number: 1:2019cv00689
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Referring Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #7 . (lih)
May 14, 2019 SECOND NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #4 . (lih)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court and to Award Costs and Attorney Fees, filed by Melvin A. Chupany. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4, #2 Certificate of Service)(Nitsche, Gary) Modified on 5/13/2019 (nms).
May 3, 2019 REQUEST: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #4 . (lih)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court and to Award Costs and Attorney Fees, filed by Savage Services Corporation, Lee A. Stroup.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Exhibits D-H, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Delia) Modified on 5/3/2019 (nms).
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORAL ORDER: The case is referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for all purposes through the case dispositive motion deadline. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/3/2019. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(nms)
April 23, 2019 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court and to Award Costs and Attorney Fees. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/7/2019. (nms)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court and to Award Costs and Attorney Fees - filed by Melvin A. Chupany. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Nitsche, Gary) Modified on 4/24/2019 (nms).
April 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Savage Services Corporation. (nmg)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N18C-06-160 JRJ (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2620306)- filed by Savage Services Corporation and Lee A. Stroup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chupany v. Stroup et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin A. Chupany
Represented By: Joel Harry Fredricks
Represented By: Gary S. Nitsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savage Services Corporation
Represented By: Delia Ann Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee A. Stroup
Represented By: Delia Ann Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?