In re: SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P.
Plaintiff: Arthur Marks, Simon Zolotarerv and Michael Cohn
Defendant: Fay West, John W. Somerhalder II, Michael G. Rippey, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., P. Michael Hardesty, Katherine T. Gates, Martha Carnes, Alvin Bledsoe, Robert A. Peiser, James E. Sweetnam, Peter B. Hamilton, John W. Rowe, SunCoke Energy, Inc. and Susan R. Landahl
Case Number: 1:2019cv00693
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 60 REPLY BRIEF re #56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, Peter B. Hamilton, P. Michael Hardesty, Susan R. Landahl, Robert A. Peiser, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Rowe, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners GP, LLC, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., SunCoke Energy, Inc., James E. Sweetnam, Fay West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-G, #2 Certificate of Compliance)(Walsh, Peter)
December 16, 2019 Filing 59 DECLARATION re #58 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Michael Cohn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Van Gorder, Michael)
December 16, 2019 Filing 58 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Michael Cohn.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance with Typeface Requirement and Type-Volume Limitation)(Van Gorder, Michael)
November 1, 2019 Filing 57 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, Peter B. Hamilton, P. Michael Hardesty, Susan R. Landahl, Robert A. Peiser, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Rowe, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners GP, LLC, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., SunCoke Energy, Inc., James E. Sweetnam, Fay West.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Exhibit A-D)(Walsh, Peter)
November 1, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint - filed by Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, Peter B. Hamilton, P. Michael Hardesty, Susan R. Landahl, Robert A. Peiser, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Rowe, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners GP, LLC, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., SunCoke Energy, Inc., James E. Sweetnam, Fay West. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Peter)
September 17, 2019 Filing 55 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violations of Sections 14(a) and 20(a) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 and Delaware State Law against Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, Peter B. Hamilton, P. Michael Hardesty, Susan R. Landahl, Robert A. Peiser, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Rowe, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners GP, LLC, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., SunCoke Energy, Inc., James E. Sweetnam, Fay West- filed by Michael Cohn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Van Gorder, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SO ORDERED, re #53 Stipulation filed by Michael Cohn. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/20/2019. (fms)
August 5, 2019 Filing 53 Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Scheduling Order re #44 Stipulation by Michael Cohn. (Van Gorder, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting (46) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (46) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:19-cv-00693-CFC; granting (9) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (9) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:19-cv-01055-CFC; granting (21) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (21) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:19-cv-01107-CFC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/31/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00693-CFC, 1:19-cv-01055-CFC, 1:19-cv-01107-CFC(nmf)
July 29, 2019 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Counsel by Michael Cohn re #50 Notice (Other), (Van Gorder, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Counsel by Michael Cohn re #46 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Gorder, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion for Consolidation, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, and Appointment of Lead Counsel, Opening Brief, and Declaration by Michael Cohn (Van Gorder, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 48 DECLARATION re #46 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael Cohn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Van Gorder, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 47 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #46 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Michael Cohn.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/22/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Michael Cohn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Gorder, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SO ORDERED, re #44 Joint STIPULATION and Order to Stay Proceedings, Case stayed. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/1/2019. (nmf)
June 28, 2019 Filing 44 Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Stay Proceedings by Arthur Marks. (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arthur Marks for the reasons stated during the telephone conference held on 6/24/2019. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/24/2019. (fms)
June 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Telephone Conference held on 6/24/2019. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00693-CFC, 1:19-cv-01107-CFC(fms)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for plaintiffs to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 6/24/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/21/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01107-CFC, 1:19-cv-00693-CFC(nmf)
June 20, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of His Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Arthur Marks re #42 Reply to Response to Motion (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arthur Marks. (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 41 DECLARATION re #40 Answering Brief in Opposition, (Declaration of Matthew B. Allen) by Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, P. Michael Hardesty, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Fay West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Walsh, Peter)
June 18, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, P. Michael Hardesty, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Fay West.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/25/2019. (Walsh, Peter)
June 18, 2019 Filing 39 JOINDER by Michael Cohn, joining in #20 Declaration, #19 Opening Brief in Support, #18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction . (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 38 DECLARATION re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Declaration of Matthew B. Allen) by Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, P. Michael Hardesty, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Fay West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Walsh, Peter)
June 17, 2019 Filing 37 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, P. Michael Hardesty, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Fay West.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/1/2019. (Walsh, Peter)
June 17, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, P. Michael Hardesty, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Fay West. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Peter)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying #21 MOTION to Shorten Time and for Expedited Hearing for the reasons stated during the telephone conference today. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/7/2019. (nmf)
June 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Telephone Conference held on 6/7/2019. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmf)
June 7, 2019 Filing 35 JOINDER by Simon Zolotarev, joining in #20 Declaration, #19 Opening Brief in Support, #18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #21 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Motion to Shorten Time and for Expedited Hearing. (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Shorten Time and for Expedited Hearing filed by Arthur Marks. (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Shorten Time and for Expedited Hearing filed by Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, P. Michael Hardesty, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Fay West.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Walsh, Peter)
June 6, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert W. Killorin and James M. Wilson for Arthur Marks added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert W. Killorin of Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP filed by Arthur Marks, #24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James M. Wilson, Jr. of Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP filed by Arthur Marks. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/6/2019. (fms)
June 5, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order by Arthur Marks re #23 Order Setting Teleconference, (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur Marks. James E. Sweetnam served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Van Gorder, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur Marks. John W. Rowe served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Van Gorder, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur Marks. Robert A. Peiser served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Van Gorder, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur Marks. Susan R. Landahl served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Van Gorder, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur Marks. Peter B. Hamilton served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Van Gorder, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur Marks. SunCoke Energy, Inc. served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Van Gorder, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert W. Killorin of Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP - filed by Arthur Marks. (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James M. Wilson, Jr. of Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP - filed by Arthur Marks. (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for plaintiff to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 6/7/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Plaintiff shall provide notice of this order to all defendants for whom counsel has not yet entered their appearance and shall file the proof of service on the docket. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/5/2019. (nmf)
June 4, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of by Arthur Marks re #20 Declaration, #19 Opening Brief in Support, #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #21 MOTION to Shorten Time and for Expedited Hearing (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 4, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Shorten Time and for Expedited Hearing - filed by Arthur Marks. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Gorder, Michael)
June 4, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Arthur Marks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Van Gorder, Michael)
June 4, 2019 Filing 19 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arthur Marks.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/18/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
June 4, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Arthur Marks. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Gorder, Michael)
June 4, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Peter B. Hamilton on 6/4/2019; Susan R. Landahl on 6/4/2019; Robert A. Peiser on 6/4/2019; John W. Rowe on 6/4/2019; SunCoke Energy, Inc. on 6/4/2019; James E. Sweetnam on 6/4/2019. (lak)
June 4, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The unsigned summons forms attached to the amended complaint at D.I. #17 have been removed from the docket entry. Unsigned summons forms should be presented in hard copy to the front counter of the Clerk's office for issuance. (fms)
May 31, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, P. Michael Hardesty, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Fay West, SunCoke Energy, Inc., Susan R. Landahl, Peter B. Hamilton, Robert A. Peiser, John W. Rowe, James E. Sweetnam- filed by Arthur Marks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Keath Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Redline of Complaints, ) (Van Gorder, Michael) Modified on 6/4/2019 (fms).
May 28, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys David D. Sterling, Paul R. Elliott, and Matthew B. Allen for Alvin Bledsoe, Katherine T. Gates, P. Michael Hardesty, Michael G. Rippey, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., and Fay West added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (amf)
May 28, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Scott Barnard and Michelle A. Reed for Martha Carnes and John W. Somerhalder II added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (amf)
May 21, 2019 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent SunCoke Energy, Inc. for SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P. filed by SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P.. (Walsh, Peter)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David D. Sterling, Paul R. Elliott and Matthew B. Allen of Baker Botts L.L.P. filed by Fay West, Michael G. Rippey, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Katherine T. Gates, Martha Carnes, Alvin Bledsoe, P. Michael Hardesty, John W. Somerhalder II, #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michelle A. Reed and M. Scott Barnard of Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP filed by Fay West, Michael G. Rippey, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Katherine T. Gates, Martha Carnes, Alvin Bledsoe, P. Michael Hardesty, John W. Somerhalder II. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/21/2019. (fms)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David D. Sterling, Paul R. Elliott and Matthew B. Allen of Baker Botts L.L.P. - filed by Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, P. Michael Hardesty, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Fay West. (Silverstein, Alan)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michelle A. Reed and M. Scott Barnard of Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP - filed by Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, P. Michael Hardesty, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Fay West. (Silverstein, Alan)
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Declaration of Matthew B. Allen) by Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, P. Michael Hardesty, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Fay West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Walsh, Peter)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, P. Michael Hardesty, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Fay West.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/31/2019. (Walsh, Peter)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, P. Michael Hardesty, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Fay West. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Peter)
April 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00693-CFC, 1:19-cv-00715-CFC (rjb)
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Arthur Marks: For Fay West waiver sent on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Arthur Marks: For SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P. waiver sent on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Arthur Marks: For John W. Somerhalder II waiver sent on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Arthur Marks: For Michael G. Rippey waiver sent on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Arthur Marks: For P. Michael Hardesty waiver sent on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Arthur Marks: For Katherine T. Gates waiver sent on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Arthur Marks: For Martha Carnes waiver sent on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Arthur Marks: For Alvin Bledsoe waiver sent on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Van Gorder, Michael)
April 17, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed per filing party's request. (lak)
April 17, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Alvin Bledsoe on 4/17/2019; Martha Carnes on 4/17/2019; Katherine T. Gates on 4/17/2019; P. Michael Hardesty on 4/17/2019; Michael G. Rippey on 4/17/2019; John W. Somerhalder II on 4/17/2019; SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P. on 4/17/2019; Fay West on 4/17/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR SECURITIES/COMMODITIES/EXCHANGE filed with Jury Demand against Alvin Bledsoe, Martha Carnes, Katherine T. Gates, P. Michael Hardesty, Michael G. Rippey, John W. Somerhalder II, SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P., Fay West - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2621319.) - filed by Arthur Marks. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Proposed Lead Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay West
Represented By: Peter J. Walsh, Jr
Represented By: Paul R. Elliott
Represented By: David D. Sterling
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Represented By: Matthew B. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Somerhalder II
Represented By: Scott Barnard
Represented By: Peter J. Walsh, Jr
Represented By: Michelle A. Reed
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G. Rippey
Represented By: Peter J. Walsh, Jr
Represented By: Paul R. Elliott
Represented By: David D. Sterling
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Represented By: Matthew B. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunCoke Energy Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Peter J. Walsh, Jr
Represented By: Paul R. Elliott
Represented By: David D. Sterling
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Represented By: Matthew B. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Michael Hardesty
Represented By: Peter J. Walsh, Jr
Represented By: Paul R. Elliott
Represented By: David D. Sterling
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Represented By: Matthew B. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine T. Gates
Represented By: Peter J. Walsh, Jr
Represented By: Paul R. Elliott
Represented By: David D. Sterling
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Represented By: Matthew B. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Carnes
Represented By: Scott Barnard
Represented By: Peter J. Walsh, Jr
Represented By: Michelle A. Reed
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Bledsoe
Represented By: Peter J. Walsh, Jr
Represented By: Paul R. Elliott
Represented By: David D. Sterling
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Represented By: Matthew B. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Peiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Sweetnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter B. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunCoke Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan R. Landahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Marks
Represented By: Michael D. Van Gorder
Represented By: James M. Wilson
Represented By: Robert W. Killorin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Zolotarerv
Represented By: Michael D. Van Gorder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cohn
Represented By: Michael D. Van Gorder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?