Cipla Limited et al v. AstraZeneca AB et al
Plaintiff: Cipla Limited and Cipla USA, Inc.
Defendant: AstraZeneca AB, Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and Zeneca Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00733
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORAL ORDER re (24 in 1:19-cv-00438-MN, 23 in 1:19-cv-00733-MN) Status Report - The parties shall file a further status report on or before 7/22/2019. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/1/2019. (dlw)
July 1, 2019 Filing 23 [SEALED] STATUS REPORT // Letter to the Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Anne Shea Gaza regarding status pursuant to the Court's June 4, 2019 Order by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc. (Gaza, Anne) Modified on 7/1/2019 (dlw).
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to File Under Seal by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc.. (Gaza, Anne)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re (22 in 1:19-cv-00733-MN, 23 in 1:19-cv-00438-MN) Stipulation and Proposed Order to File Under Seal. The 7/1/2019 Status Report and all subsequent Status Reports related to the issues discussed during the 6/4/2019 teleconference shall be filed UNDER SEAL. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/1/2019. (dlw)
June 4, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Telephone Conference held on 6/4/2019. The Scheduling Teleconference in this matter will be continued pending the submission of a Status Report as discussed. The parties shall submit a Status Report to the court on or before July 1, 2019. (Court Reporter: Valerie Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00438-MN, 1:19-cv-00733-MN(asw)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORAL ORDER Setting Rule 16 Teleconference: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Rule 16 Scheduling Teleconference is set for 6/4/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Any party wishing to join the call shall do so by individually dialing into 302-573-4545 not earlier than 1:55 PM. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/30/2019. (dlw)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER [Scheduling Order] by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika)(Wilson, Samantha)
May 16, 2019 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Zeneca Inc. filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Zeneca Inc.. (Silver, Daniel)
May 16, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Zeneca Inc..(Silver, Daniel)
May 14, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert Stout for Cipla Limited and Cipla USA, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00438-MN, 1:19-cv-00733-MN(ddp)
May 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Anna Q. Han for Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, and Zeneca Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00438-MN, 1:19-cv-00733-MN(ddp)
May 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Einar Stole for Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, and Zeneca Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00438-MN, 1:19-cv-00733-MN(ddp)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re (17 in 1:19-cv-00733-MN, 20 in 1:19-cv-00438-MN) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Einar Stole and Anna Q. Han filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB, Zeneca Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/10/2019. (dlw)
May 9, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Einar Stole and Anna Q. Han - filed by Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Zeneca Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Einar Stole and Anna Q. Han)(Silver, Daniel)
May 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Zeneca Inc. (Joyce, Alexandra)
May 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Kelly on behalf of Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Zeneca Inc. (Kelly, Michael)
May 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Zeneca Inc. (Silver, Daniel)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re (19 in 1:19-cv-00438-MN, 13 in 1:19-cv-00733-MN) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dennies Varughese, Pharm.D., Uma N. Everett and Robert Stout filed by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/6/2019. (dlw)
May 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dennies Varughese, Pharm.D., Uma N. Everett and Robert Stout - filed by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha)
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cipla USA, Inc., Cipla Limited. Zeneca Inc. served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Wilson, Samantha)
May 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cipla USA, Inc., Cipla Limited. Aktiebolaget Hassle served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Wilson, Samantha)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cipla USA, Inc., Cipla Limited. AstraZeneca AB served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Wilson, Samantha)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cipla USA, Inc., Cipla Limited. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Wilson, Samantha)
May 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint, by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B)(Wilson, Samantha)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting D.I. #1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/25/2019. (nmg)
April 25, 2019 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (nmg)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent InvaGen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Corporate Parent Cipla Limited, Corporate Parent Cipla (EU Limited) for Cipla USA, Inc. filed by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc. (nmg)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,428,810. (nmg)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 8/31/2018. Date of Expiration of Patent: 11/3/2019. (nmg)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity filed against Aktiebolaget Hassle, AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Zeneca Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX031705.) - filed by Cipla USA, Inc., Cipla Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal - filed by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nmg)
April 24, 2019 Remark: Exit copies to Duty Judge (MN). (nmg)
April 24, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Aktiebolaget Hassle on 4/24/2019; AstraZeneca AB on 4/24/2019; AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 4/24/2019; Zeneca Inc. on 4/24/2019. (nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cipla Limited et al v. AstraZeneca AB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca AB
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Einar Stole
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Anna Q. Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aktiebolaget Hassle
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Einar Stole
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Anna Q. Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Einar Stole
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Anna Q. Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeneca Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Einar Stole
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Anna Q. Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cipla Limited
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Represented By: Robert Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cipla USA, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Represented By: Robert Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?