Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. et al v. Kirby Inland Marine, LP
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. and Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited
Defendant: Kirby Inland Marine, LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00740
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint - filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A (Second Amended Complaint), #3 Exhibit A-C (to Second Amended Complaint), #4 Exhibit B (Redline), #5 Exhibit C (Copyright Form))(O'Byrne, Stephanie)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s) (See the attached Schedule A). (O'Byrne, Stephanie)
June 5, 2019 Copyright Report to Register of Copyrights NOTICE: Please note that if copyright registrations are being added to this case, the filing party should complete the Copyright Report to Register of Copyrights, and enter it on the docket using the Copyright Report to Register of Copyrights event in the OTHER DOCUMENT list. The Copyright Report to Register of Copyrights Form can be found at www.ded.uscourts.gov under the Clerk's Office FORMS button. (fms)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Kirby Inland Marine, LP- filed by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited.(fms)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/4/2019. (fms)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File (Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint) - filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint with Exs. A-C, #3 Exhibit B - Redline)(O'Byrne, Stephanie)
May 23, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Kirby Inland Marine, LP on 5/23/2019. (lak)
May 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00740-CFC, 1:19-cv-00781-CFC, 1:19-cv-00783-CFC (rjb)
April 25, 2019 No Summons Issued. (amf)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Koeing Limited for Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited and Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. - filed by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited and Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (amf)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s) - please see attached report. (amf)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Kirby Inland Marine, LP - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2627508) - filed by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. and Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. et al v. Kirby Inland Marine, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie E. O'Byrne
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Tracey E. Timlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited
Represented By: Stephanie E. O'Byrne
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Tracey E. Timlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirby Inland Marine, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?