Cirba Inc. et al v. VMware, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cirba Inc., Cirba IP, Inc. and Cirba Inc. (d/b/a Densify)
Defendant: VMware, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00742
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Andrew Hillier on July 17, 2019 (Amended) filed by VMware, Inc..(Wilson, Samantha)
July 3, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Vijay Madisetti on July 12, 2019 (Amended) filed by VMware, Inc..(Wilson, Samantha)
July 3, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Riyaz Somani on July 9, 2019 (Amended) filed by VMware, Inc..(Wilson, Samantha)
July 2, 2019 Filing 80 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #79 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 as to Claim 1 of the First Amended Complaint filed by VMware, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Gaza, Anne)
July 2, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 as to Claim 1 of the First Amended Complaint - filed by VMware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaza, Anne)
June 28, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice of VMware, Inc. filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Deposition and Subpoena of Erik Wrobel by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories to VMware (Nos. 11-15); and (2) Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production to VMware (Nos. 22-27) filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 26, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' responses to VMware, Inc.'s Second Set of Requests for Production (Preliminary Injunction) (Nos. 51-71) filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 25, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) VMware, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant (Nos. 1-21), and 2) VMware, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant (Nos. 1-10) filed by VMware, Inc..(Wilson, Samantha)
June 25, 2019 Filing 73 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate EMC Corporation, Other Affiliate Dell Inc., Other Affiliate Denali Intermediate Inc., Other Affiliate Dell Technologies Inc., Other Affiliate VWM Holdco LLC for VMware, Inc. filed by VMware, Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha)
June 25, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to VMware, Inc.'s 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice to Plaintiffs filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 24, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Densify's responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories (Preliminary Injunction) Nos. 1-15; and (2) Densify's responses to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production (Preliminary Injunction) Nos. 1-50) filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 20, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Wesley Lanier White for Cirba IP, Inc., for Cirba Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 70 MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc. in the form of a DVD. Filing related to #68 Amended Complaint, #69 Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). (ntl)
June 18, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: DVD containing videos cited in Plaintiffs' Complaint as Exhibits 31-36. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Kenneth Laurence Dorsney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 18, 2019 Filing 68 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Cirba Inc., Cirba IP, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #67 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wesley Lanier White filed by Cirba Inc., Cirba IP, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/18/19. (ntl)
June 18, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kate M. Falkenstien for Cirba IP, Inc. and Cirba Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wesley Lanier White - filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 14, 2019 Filing 66 REDACTED VERSION of #49 Declaration of Jennifer Luh by VMware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Exhibit 11-24)(Gaza, Anne)
June 14, 2019 Filing 65 REDACTED VERSION of #52 Declaration of Ajay Singh by VMware, Inc.. (Gaza, Anne)
June 14, 2019 Filing 64 REDACTED VERSION of #51 Declaration of Chandra Prathuri by VMware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaza, Anne)
June 14, 2019 Filing 63 REDACTED VERSION of #48 Answering Brief in Opposition by VMware, Inc.. (Gaza, Anne)
June 13, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendant VMware, Inc.'s Second Set of Requests for Production (Preliminary Injunction) to Plaintiffs Nos. 51-71; 2) Defendant VMware, Inc.'s Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition (Preliminary Injunction); 3) Defendant VMware, Inc.'s Notice of Deposition of Riyaz Somani (Preliminary Injunction); 4) Defendant VMware, Inc.'s Notice of Deposition of Andrew Hillier (Preliminary Injunction); and 5) Defendant VMware, Inc.'s Notice of Deposition of Vijay Madisetti (Preliminary Injunction) filed by VMware, Inc..(Wilson, Samantha)
June 13, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jason Nieh filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 13, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Chandra Prathuri filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 13, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ajay Singh filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #58 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kate Falkenstien filed by Cirba Inc., Cirba IP, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/12/19. (ntl)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #43 STIPULATION to Extend Page Limit for VMware's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and for Leave to File Under Seal filed by VMware, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/12/19. (ntl)
June 11, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kate Falkenstien - filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 11, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendant VMware, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production (Preliminary Injunction) to Plaintiffs Nos. 1-50, and 2) Defendant VMware, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Preliminary Injunction) to Plaintiffs Nos. 1-15 filed by VMware, Inc..(Wilson, Samantha)
June 10, 2019 Filing 56 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Anne Shea Gaza regarding VMware's withdrawal of request to reschedule the August 6 hearing - re #53 Letter, #44 Letter. (Gaza, Anne)
June 10, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) First Set of Interrogatories and (2) First Set of Requsts for Production filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 10, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE to Take Deposition of VMware, Inc. filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 10, 2019 Filing 53 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Kenneth L. Dorsney regarding response to VMware's June 7, 2019 letter requesting rescheduling of August 6 hearing. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 7, 2019 Filing 52 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #48 Answering Brief in Opposition - Declaration of Ajay Singh - by VMware, Inc.. (Gaza, Anne)
June 7, 2019 Filing 51 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #48 Answering Brief in Opposition - Declaration of Chandra Prathuri - by VMware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaza, Anne)
June 7, 2019 Filing 50 DECLARATION re #48 Answering Brief in Opposition - Declaration of Dr. Jason Nieh - by VMware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-10, #3 Exhibit 11-20, #4 Exhibit 21-30, #5 Exhibit 31-38)(Gaza, Anne)
June 7, 2019 Filing 49 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #48 Answering Brief in Opposition - Declaration of Jennifer Luh - by VMware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Exhibit 11-24)(Gaza, Anne)
June 7, 2019 Filing 48 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by VMware, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/14/2019. (Gaza, Anne)
June 7, 2019 Filing 47 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 as to Claim 1 of the Complaint filed by VMware, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Gaza, Anne)
June 7, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 as to Claim 1 of the Complaint - filed by VMware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaza, Anne)
June 7, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected document added to D.I. 45 per request of counsel. (ntl)
June 7, 2019 Filing 45 DECLARATION re #44 Letter // DECLARATION of Brooks M. Beard in Support of VMware's Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark Regarding Rescheduling August 6 Hearing by VMware, Inc.. (Gaza, Anne) (Main Document 45 replaced on 6/7/2019) (ntl).
June 7, 2019 Filing 44 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Anne Shea Gaza regarding rescheduling of the August 6th hearing - re 38 Order,,,,,, Set Hearings,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gaza, Anne)
June 7, 2019 Filing 43 STIPULATION to Extend Page Limit for VMware's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and for Leave to File Under Seal by VMware, Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha)
June 4, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Elizabeth Ann Patterson for VMware, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elizabeth Ann Patterson filed by VMware, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/4/19. (ntl)
June 4, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Christopher J. Wiener as co-counsel.. (Wilson, Samantha)
May 29, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elizabeth Ann Patterson - filed by VMware, Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re #36 MOTION to File Reply Brief in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery Under Seal filed by Cirba Inc., Cirba IP, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/28/19. (ntl)
May 24, 2019 Filing 39 REDACTED VERSION of #37 Reply Brief In support of motion for hearing and expedited discovery by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' briefing (D.I. 16, 17, 34, 37), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall, no later than June 7, file a brief in response to the motion for preliminary injunction (D.I. 11), sufficient to allow the parties and the Court to understand what disputes may need to be resolved in connection with Plaintiffs' motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Hearing and Expedited Discovery (D.I. 16) is GRANTED. Accordingly, the parties shall: (1) conduct expedited discovery from June 10 to July 17, which shall include: (i) written discovery, with responses due 14 days after service, (ii) one Rule 30(b)(6) deposition each, and (iii) depositions of the other party's declarants (as well as Ajay Singh) and/or other relevant third parties; (2) no later than July 24, simultaneously submit post-discovery supplemental briefing not to exceed 10 pages (double spaced); and (3) no later than July 29, simultaneously submit reply briefing not to exceed 5 pages (double spaced). If Defendant files its proposed motion to dismiss, briefing shall proceed in accordance with the local rules, and in that event Defendant's motion will be argued at the same hearing as Plaintiff's motion. The Court will hold a hearing on Tuesday, August 6 at 10:00 a.m. Each side will be allocated two (2) hours for its presentation. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/22/19. (ntl)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #35 Stipulation and Order filed by VMware, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/20/19. (ntl)
May 17, 2019 Filing 37 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #16 MOTION for Hearing and Expedited Discovery filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 17, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to File Reply Brief in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery Under Seal - filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 17, 2019 Filing 35 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order extending VMwares deadline to file an opposition to Cirbas Motion for a Preliminary Injunction to May 30, 2019, or such other date that the Court may order by VMware, Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha)
May 15, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION for Hearing and Expedited Discovery filed by VMware, Inc.. (Gaza, Anne)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #33 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to move against, answer, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs' Complaint to June 17, 2019 filed by VMware, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/14/19. (ntl)
May 10, 2019 Filing 33 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to move against, answer, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs' Complaint to June 17, 2019 - filed by VMware, Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed Plaintiff's motions and related materials (see D.I. 11-17), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (i) no later than Wednesday, May 15, Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's motion for expedited discovery and their proposal for how this case should proceed; and (ii) no later than Friday, May 17, Plaintiff shall file a reply. The Court will determine thereafter whether a teleconference or other proceeding is required. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/10/19. (ntl)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott F. Llewellyn filed by VMware, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/9/19. (ntl)
May 9, 2019 Filing 31 MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc. in the form of a DVD. Filing related to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #12 Opening Brief in Support, #13 Declaration, #14 Declaration, #18 Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). (ntl)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION and [Proposed] Order for Page Limit Extension filed by Cirba Inc., Cirba IP, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/8/19. (ntl)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re #9 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Cirba Inc., Cirba IP, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/8/19. (ntl)
May 9, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher J. Wiener for VMware, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (amf)
May 8, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christine E. Lehman for Cirba IP, Inc., for Cirba Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
May 8, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Courtland L. Reichman, Sarah O. Jorgensen, Shawna L. Ballard, Jennifer Estremera, Phillip Lee, Michael G. Flanigan, Joachim B. Steinberg, and Jaime F Cardenas-Navia for Cirba IP, Inc. and Cirba Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (amf)
May 7, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott F. Llewellyn - filed by VMware, Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard S. J. Hung filed by VMware, Inc., #23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael A. Jacobs and Attorney Christopher J. Wiener filed by VMware, Inc., #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Courtland L. Reichman, Attorney Sarah O. Jorgensen, Attorney Christine E. Lehman, Attorney Shawna L. Ballard, Attorney Jennifer Estremera, Attorney Phillip Lee, Attorney Michael G. Flanigan, Attorney Joachi filed by Cirba Inc., Cirba IP, Inc., #27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer Luh filed by VMware, Inc., #28 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bita Rahebi filed by VMware, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/7/19. (ntl)
May 6, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bita Rahebi - filed by VMware, Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha)
May 6, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer Luh - filed by VMware, Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha)
May 6, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard S. J. Hung - filed by VMware, Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha)
May 6, 2019 Filing 25 REDACTED VERSION of #17 Opening Brief in Support of Motion for Hearing and Expedited Discovery by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 6, 2019 Filing 24 REDACTED VERSION of #15 Declaration of Riyaz Somani by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 6, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael A. Jacobs and Attorney Christopher J. Wiener - filed by VMware, Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha)
May 6, 2019 Filing 22 REDACTED VERSION of #14 Declaration of Andrew Hillier by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 6, 2019 Filing 21 REDACTED VERSION of #12 Opening Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 6, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha G. Wilson on behalf of VMware, Inc. (Wilson, Samantha)
May 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Shea Gaza on behalf of VMware, Inc. (Gaza, Anne)
May 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: Certain Exhibits referenced in the Declarations of Mr. Andrew Hillier and Dr. Vijay Madisetti in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Kenneth Laurence Dorsney on behalf of Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 6, 2019 Filing 17 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #16 MOTION for Hearing and Expedited Discovery filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/20/2019. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 6, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Hearing and Expedited Discovery - filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc.. (Attachments: #1 7.1.1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 6, 2019 Filing 15 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #12 Opening Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (executed by Riyaz Somani) by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 6, 2019 Filing 14 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #12 Opening Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (executed by Andrew Hillier) by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 6, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION re #12 Opening Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (executed by Dr. Vijay Madisetti) by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/20/2019. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc.. (Attachments: #1 7.1.1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION and [Proposed] Order for Page Limit Extension - filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc.. (Attachments: #1 7.1.1 Certification)(Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal - filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc.. (Attachments: #1 7.1.1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Courtland L. Reichman, Attorney Sarah O. Jorgensen, Attorney Christine E. Lehman, Attorney Shawna L. Ballard, Attorney Jennifer Estremera, Attorney Phillip Lee, Attorney Michael G. Flanigan, Attorney Joachim B. Steinberg, and Attorney Jaime F. Cardenas-Navia - filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by Cirba IP, Inc., Cirba Inc. in the form of a DVD. Filing related to #5 Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials, #1 Complaint. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). (ntl)
May 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cirba Inc., Cirba IP, Inc.. VMware, Inc. served on 4/26/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
April 25, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to VMware, Inc. on 4/25/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (amf)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing the following non-paper material(s) in multi media format: DVD containing videos cited in Plaintiffs' Complaint as Exhibits 31-36, which correspond to Exhibits 1-3, 7, 11, 15, 29, and 30. Original non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Kenneth Laurence Dorsney on behalf of Cirba IP, Inc. and Cirba Inc. (amf)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Cirba Inc. for Cirba IP, Inc. - filed by Cirba IP, Inc. and Cirba Inc. (amf) Modified on 4/25/2019 (amf).
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,209,687 B2 and 9,654,367 B2. (amf)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against VMware, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2627802) - filed by Cirba Inc. and Cirba IP, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-36, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf) Modified on 4/25/2019 (amf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cirba Inc. et al v. VMware, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cirba Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Jaime F Cardenas-Navia
Represented By: Courtland L. Reichman
Represented By: Christine E. Lehman
Represented By: Shawna L. Ballard
Represented By: Michael G. Flanigan
Represented By: Sarah O. Jorgensen
Represented By: Wesley Lanier White
Represented By: Jennifer Estremera
Represented By: Phillip Lee
Represented By: Kate M. Falkenstien
Represented By: Joachim B. Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cirba IP, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Jaime F Cardenas-Navia
Represented By: Courtland L. Reichman
Represented By: Christine E. Lehman
Represented By: Shawna L. Ballard
Represented By: Michael G. Flanigan
Represented By: Sarah O. Jorgensen
Represented By: Wesley Lanier White
Represented By: Jennifer Estremera
Represented By: Phillip Lee
Represented By: Kate M. Falkenstien
Represented By: Joachim B. Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cirba Inc. (d/b/a Densify)
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Jaime F Cardenas-Navia
Represented By: Courtland L. Reichman
Represented By: Christine E. Lehman
Represented By: Shawna L. Ballard
Represented By: Michael G. Flanigan
Represented By: Sarah O. Jorgensen
Represented By: Wesley Lanier White
Represented By: Jennifer Estremera
Represented By: Phillip Lee
Represented By: Kate M. Falkenstien
Represented By: Joachim B. Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMware, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Patterson
Represented By: Christopher J. Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?