Pfizer Inc. et al. v. Hetero USA, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., Pfizer Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC and PF Prism C.V.
Defendant: Hetero Drugs, Ltd., Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs, Ltd. Unit-V and Hetero Labs, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00751
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (9 in 1:19-cv-00747-CFC, 10 in 1:19-cv-00743-CFC, 9 in 1:19-cv-00750-CFC, 10 in 1:19-cv-00748-CFC, 13 in 1:19-cv-00751-CFC, 9 in 1:19-cv-00752-CFC, 10 in 1:19-cv-00760-CFC, 9 in 1:19-cv-00753-CFC, 9 in 1:19-cv-00754-CFC, 9 in 1:19-cv-00745-CFC, 10 in 1:19-cv-00758-CFC, 9 in 1:19-cv-00749-CFC, 9 in 1:19-cv-00759-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kathryn S. Kayali and Seth R. Bowers of WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/20/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00743-CFC et al.(fms)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kathryn S. Kayali and Seth R. Bowers of WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP - filed by PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hetero Drugs, Ltd., Hetero Labs, Ltd., Hetero Labs, Ltd. Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc..(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (11 in 1:19-cv-00751-CFC, 8 in 1:19-cv-00754-CFC, 6 in 1:19-cv-00758-CFC, 6 in 1:19-cv-00760-CFC, 8 in 1:19-cv-00745-CFC, 8 in 1:19-cv-00747-CFC, 9 in 1:19-cv-00748-CFC, 8 in 1:19-cv-00753-CFC, 8 in 1:19-cv-00759-CFC, 8 in 1:19-cv-00749-CFC, 6 in 1:19-cv-00743-CFC, 6 in 1:19-cv-00750-CFC, 8 in 1:19-cv-00752-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David I. Berl, Christopher J. Mandernach and Michael Xun Liu filed by Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/17/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00743-CFC et al.(fms)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David I. Berl, Christopher J. Mandernach and Michael Xun Liu - filed by PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Dellinger, Megan)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V.: For Hetero USA Inc. waiver sent on 5/8/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Dellinger, Megan)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V.: For Hetero Labs, Ltd. waiver sent on 5/8/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Dellinger, Megan)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V.: For Hetero Labs, Ltd. Unit-V waiver sent on 5/8/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Dellinger, Megan)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V.: For Hetero Drugs, Ltd. waiver sent on 5/8/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Dellinger, Megan)
May 14, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Dmitry Shelhoff and Edward D. Pergament for Hetero Drugs, Ltd., Hetero Labs, Ltd., Hetero Labs, Ltd. Unit-V, and Hetero USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dmitry V. Shelhoff and Edward D. Pergament filed by Hetero Labs, Ltd., Hetero Labs, Ltd. Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Drugs, Ltd. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/10/2019. (fms)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dmitry V. Shelhoff and Edward D. Pergament - filed by Hetero Drugs, Ltd., Hetero Labs, Ltd., Hetero Labs, Ltd. Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
May 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00743-CFC, 1:19-cv-00745-CFC, 1:19-cv-00747-CFC through 1:19-cv-00754-CFC, and 1:19-cv-00758-CFC through 1:19-cv-00760-CFC (rjb)
April 26, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Hetero Drugs, Ltd. on 4/26/2019; Hetero Labs, Ltd. on 4/26/2019; Hetero Labs, Ltd. Unit-V on 4/26/2019; Hetero USA Inc. on 4/26/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer Inc. for PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., Warner-Lambert Company LLC filed by PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V., Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (lak)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,936,612 B2 ;7,208,489 B2 ;7,456,168 B2. (lak)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 3/28/2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: See attachment.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 8/3/2022. (lak)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed against Hetero Drugs, Ltd., Hetero Labs, Ltd., Hetero Labs, Ltd. Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2628106.) - filed by PF Prism C.V., Pfizer Inc., Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC, Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfizer Inc. et al. v. Hetero USA, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pfizer Manufacturing Holdings LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pfizer PFE Ireland Pharmaceuticals Holding 1 B.V.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Lambert Company LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PF Prism C.V.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Drugs, Ltd.
Represented By: Dmitry Shelhoff
Represented By: Edward D. Pergament
Represented By: Benjamin J. Schladweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero USA Inc.
Represented By: Dmitry Shelhoff
Represented By: Edward D. Pergament
Represented By: Benjamin J. Schladweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs, Ltd. Unit-V
Represented By: Dmitry Shelhoff
Represented By: Edward D. Pergament
Represented By: Benjamin J. Schladweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs, Ltd.
Represented By: Dmitry Shelhoff
Represented By: Edward D. Pergament
Represented By: Benjamin J. Schladweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?