In Re: TSAWD Holdings, Inc., et al
Appellant: Sport Dimension, Inc. and Body Glove
Appellee: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Debtor: TSAWD Holdings, Inc., et al.,
Case Number: 1:2019cv00762
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SO ORDERED Granting #11 Stipulation Dismissing Appeal (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/24/2019. (nms)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Sport Dimension, Inc.. (O'Brien, Daniel)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF ISSUES on Appeal filed by Sport Dimension, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'Brien, Daniel)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Sport Dimension, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'Brien, Daniel)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SO ORDERED Granting #7 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation and establishing briefing schedule (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/4/2019. (nms)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/3/19. (cak)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 5/31/2019 at 2:00 PM Eastern Time before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Counsel for appellant shall initiate the teleconference call. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/23/19. (cak)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: The teleconference set for 5/21/19 at 9:30 a.m. Eastern Time with Judge Thynge has been rescheduled to 5/22/2019 at 5:00 PM Eastern Time. Counsel for appellant shall initiate the teleconference call. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/16/19. (cak)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Pursuant to this Courts Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court under to 28 U.S.C. 158; IT IS ORDERED that a teleconference has been scheduled for Tuesday, May 21, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. Eastern Time with Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge related to the screening process for mediation. Counsel for the appellant shall initiate the teleconference call. Local counsel are reminded of their obligations to inform out-of-state counsel of this Order. To avoid the imposition of sanctions, counsel shall advise the Court immediately of any problems regarding compliance with this Order. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/15/19. (cak)
May 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Tuesday, May 14, 2019, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/30/19. (cak)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (nmg)
April 29, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (nmg)
April 29, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (nmg)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 4/12/2019 by Judge Mary F. Walrath in Bankruptcy case number 16-10527 MFW. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Sport Dimension, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Opinion on Appeal, #3 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: TSAWD Holdings, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sport Dimension, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel A. O'Brien
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Edmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Body Glove
Represented By: Daniel A. O'Brien
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Edmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Butz
Represented By: Gregory W. Werkheiser
Represented By: Robert J. Dehney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: TSAWD Holdings, Inc., et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?