Kang v. True Religion Apparel, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jack Kang
Defendant: True Religion Apparel, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00771
Filed: April 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 Stipulation to Stay filed by True Religion Apparel, Inc. -- Case Stayed. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/3/19. (ntl)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Stay Action by True Religion Apparel, Inc.. (Poff, Adam)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint to July 2, 2019 filed by True Religion Apparel, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/24/19. (ntl)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint to July 2, 2019 - filed by True Religion Apparel, Inc.. (Poff, Adam)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint to June 20, 2019 filed by True Religion Apparel, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/20/19. (ntl)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint to June 20, 2019 - filed by True Religion Apparel, Inc.. (Poff, Adam)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Kang. True Religion Apparel, Inc. served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
May 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00770-LPS, 1:19-cv-00771-LPS (rjb)
April 29, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to True Religion Apparel, Inc. on 4/29/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
April 28, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
April 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against True Religion Apparel, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2629431.) - filed by Jack Kang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kang v. True Religion Apparel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Kang
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True Religion Apparel, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?