In Re: Washington Mutual, Inc., et al
Debtor: Washington Mutual, Inc., et al.
Appellant: Alice Griffin
Appellee: WMI Liquidating Trust
Case Number: 1:2019cv00775
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Appellant Brief by Alice Griffin (Griffin, Alice)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 Appellant's BRIEF by Alice Griffin. Appellee Brief due by 7/8/2019. (Griffin, Alice)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 JOINDER by Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, joining in #9 Counter-Statement of the Issues and Counter-Designation of the Record Regarding Appeal. (Bowden, William) Modified on 5/28/2019 (nms).
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 Counter-Statement of the Issues and Counter-Designation of the Record Regarding Appeal, filed by WMI Liquidating Trust. (De Lillo, Christopher) Modified on 5/28/2019 (nms).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Appeal Briefing Schedule (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/22/2019. (nms)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SO ORDERED Granting #3 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/21/2019. (nms)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Alice Griffin (Griffin, Alice)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SO ORDERED Granting #4 MOTION for Authoization to File Electronically, filed by Alice Griffin. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/13/2019. (nms)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION and Order for Authoization to File Electronically - filed by Alice Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddp)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/3/19. ***A copy of this Recommendation was mailed to Appellant to her address of record on 5-3-19*** (cak)
May 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (nmg)
April 29, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (nmg)
April 29, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (nmg)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 4/24/2019 by Judge Mary F. Walrath in Bankruptcy case number 08-12229 MFW. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Alice Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Washington Mutual, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Washington Mutual, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Alice Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WMI Liquidating Trust
Represented By: Amanda Rose Steele
Represented By: Paul N. Heath
Represented By: Mark David Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?