In re: ManagedStorage International, Inc., et al.
Appellant: Jeoffrey L. Burtch, Chapter 7 Trustee
Debtor: ManagedStorage International, Inc., et al.
Appellee: AVT Technologies
Case Number: 1:2019cv00802
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Annapoorni R. Sankaran filed by AVT Technologies. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/20/19. (ntl)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Annapoorni R. Sankaran - filed by AVT Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification)(Meloro, Dennis)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/18/19. (cak)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by AVT Technologies Counter-Designation of Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal (Meloro, Dennis)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Jeoffrey L. Burtch, Chapter 7 Trustee Designation of Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lodging of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 137, #3 Exhibit 138, #4 Exhibit 139, #5 Exhibit 140, #6 Exhibit 141, #7 Exhibit 142, #8 Exhibit 143, #9 Exhibit 144, #10 Exhibit 145, #11 Exhibit 146, #12 Exhibit 147, #13 Exhibit 148, #14 Exhibit 149, #15 Exhibit 150, #16 Certificate of Service)(Dick, Robert)
May 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Wednesday, May 15, 2019, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/1/19. (cak)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (ceg)
April 30, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (ceg)
April 30, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED. (ceg)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 4/17/2019 by Judge Mary F. Walrath in Bankruptcy case number 09-10368. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Jeoffrey L. Burtch, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Opinion, #2 Order, #3 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: ManagedStorage International, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jeoffrey L. Burtch, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By: Robert Grant Dick, IV
Represented By: Robert W. Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: ManagedStorage International, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: AVT Technologies
Represented By: Dennis Anthony Meloro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?