NRT Technology Corp. et al v. Everi Holdings Inc. et al
Plaintiff: NRT Technologies, Inc. and NRT Technology Corp.
Defendant: Everi Holdings Inc. and Everi Payments Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00804
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Quynh M. Chen, Miya Yusa, Colby B. Springer for NRT Technologies, Inc., Springer for NRT Technology Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Colby B. Springer, #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Quynh M. Chen, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Miya Yusa filed by NRT Technologies, Inc., NRT Technology Corp. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/20/2019. (dlw)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Quynh M. Chen - filed by NRT Technologies, Inc., NRT Technology Corp.. (Belitz, Christina)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Miya Yusa - filed by NRT Technologies, Inc., NRT Technology Corp.. (Belitz, Christina)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Colby B. Springer - filed by NRT Technologies, Inc., NRT Technology Corp.. (Belitz, Christina)
May 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 30, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Everi Holdings Inc. on 5/1/2019; Everi Payments Inc. on 5/1/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,081,792. (myr)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR ANTITRUST filed with Jury Demand against Everi Holdings Inc., Everi Payments Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2631798.) - filed by NRT Technology Corp., NRT Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NRT Technology Corp. et al v. Everi Holdings Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everi Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everi Payments Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NRT Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Marie Belitz
Represented By: Richard Montgomery Donaldson
Represented By: Miya Yusa
Represented By: Colby B. Springer
Represented By: Quynh M. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NRT Technology Corp.
Represented By: Christina Marie Belitz
Represented By: Richard Montgomery Donaldson
Represented By: Miya Yusa
Represented By: Colby B. Springer
Represented By: Quynh M. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?