Lighting Science Group Corp. v. Cooper Lighting LLC
Plaintiff: Lighting Science Group Corp.
Defendant: Eaton Corporation plc, Cooper Lighting, LLC and Cooper Industries LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00808
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 CASE CLOSED (ntl)
November 13, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lighting Science Group Corp. as to Cooper Lighting, LLC (Day, John)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #21 Stipulation of Dismissal of Certain Defendants -- Party Cooper Industries LLC and Eaton Corporation plc terminated. Motion terminated: #17 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/25/19. (ntl)
October 24, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Certain Defendants by Lighting Science Group Corp.. (Day, John)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #20 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to October 24, 2019 filed by Lighting Science Group Corp. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/17/19. (ntl)
October 16, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to October 24, 2019 - filed by Lighting Science Group Corp.. (Day, John)
October 3, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person -- Declaration of Nigel Crawford -- by Cooper Industries LLC, Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation plc. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 3, 2019 Filing 18 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person filed by Cooper Industries LLC, Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation plc.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/17/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 3, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person - filed by Cooper Industries LLC, Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation plc. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Terrence J. Wikberg and Amy E. Simpson filed by Eaton Corporation plc, Cooper Industries LLC, Cooper Lighting, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/21/19. (ntl)
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Terrence J. Wikberg and Amy E. Simpson - filed by Cooper Industries LLC, Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation plc. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants to respond to the Complaint to October 3, 2019 - filed by Cooper Industries LLC, Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation plc. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants to respond to the Complaint to October 3, 2019 filed by Eaton Corporation plc, Cooper Industries LLC, Cooper Lighting, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/20/19. (ntl)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Eaton Corporation plc to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint (D.I. 1) to August 20, 2019 filed by Eaton Corporation plc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/17/19. (ntl)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Eaton Corporation plc to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint (D.I. 1) to August 20, 2019 - filed by Eaton Corporation plc. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Sealed Complaint with Exhibits, Motion for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal, and Order Granting Motion served on Eaton Corporation plc on June 25, 2019, filed by Lighting Science Group Corp.. (Mayo, Andrew)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Cooper Lighting, LLC, and Cooper Industries LLC to respond to the Complaint to August 20, 2019 filed by Cooper Industries LLC, Cooper Lighting, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/9/19. (ntl)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Cooper Lighting, LLC, and Cooper Industries LLC to respond to the Complaint to August 20, 2019 - filed by Cooper Industries LLC, Cooper Lighting, LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (11 in 1:19-cv-00808-LPS, 10 in 1:19-cv-00798-LPS, 11 in 1:19-cv-00807-LPS, 27 in 1:19-cv-00806-LPS, 16 in 1:19-cv-00805-LPS, 10 in 1:19-cv-00797-LPS, 10 in 1:19-cv-00809-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kayvan B. Noroozi filed by Lighting Science Group Corp. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/25/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00797-LPS et al. (ntl)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kayvan B. Noroozi - filed by Lighting Science Group Corp.. (Mayo, Andrew)
June 3, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Eaton Corporation plc on 6/3/2019. (nmg)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants to respond to the Complaint to July 8, 2019 filed by Eaton Corporation plc, Cooper Industries LLC, Cooper Lighting, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/24/19. (ntl)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants to respond to the Complaint to July 8, 2019 - filed by Cooper Industries LLC, Cooper Lighting, LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 5/22/2019 (ntl).
May 17, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher S. Stewart for Lighting Science Group Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00798-LPS et al.(ddp)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (8 in 1:19-cv-00798-LPS, 8 in 1:19-cv-00809-LPS, 10 in 1:19-cv-00805-LPS, 9 in 1:19-cv-00808-LPS, 8 in 1:19-cv-00797-LPS, 11 in 1:19-cv-00806-LPS, 8 in 1:19-cv-00807-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher S. Stewart filed by Lighting Science Group Corp. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/16/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00797-LPS et al. (ntl)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher S. Stewart - filed by Lighting Science Group Corp.. (Day, John)
May 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00797-LPS, 1:19-cv-00798-LPS and 1:19-cv-00805-LPS through 1:19-cv-00809-LPS (rjb)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lighting Science Group Corp.. Cooper Lighting, LLC served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. (Mayo, Andrew)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lighting Science Group Corp.. Cooper Industries LLC served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. (Mayo, Andrew)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - granting #1 Motion to Seal Complaint and Exhibits. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/2/19. (rwc)
May 2, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Cooper Industries LLC on 5/2/2019; Cooper Lighting, LLC on 5/2/2019. (nmg)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint, filed by Lighting Science Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibits 1-10)(rwc)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,095,053 ;7,098,483 ;7,528,421 ;8,506,118 ;8,674,608. (rwc)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Cooper Industries LLC, Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation plc - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX031734.) - filed by Lighting Science Group Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-10, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Letter)(rwc)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint and Related Documents Under Seal - filed by Lighting Science Group Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(rwc)
May 1, 2019 Remark : Exit copies to Duty Judge (LPS). (rwc)
May 1, 2019 No Summons Issued. (rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lighting Science Group Corp. v. Cooper Lighting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation plc
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Lighting, LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lighting Science Group Corp.
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Represented By: John G. Day
Represented By: Christopher S. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?