Mock v. Division of State Police, Department of Safety and Homeland Security of the State of Delaware

Plaintiff: Shawn Mock
Defendant: Division of State Police, Department of Safety and Homeland Security of the State of Delaware
Case Number: 1:2019cv00832
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand this matter to the Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware (C.A. No. 1019-0229 MTZ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Award Fees and Costs is WITHDRAWN (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/11/2019. (nms)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court, filed by Division of State Police, Department of Safety and Homeland Security of the State of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martinelli, Adria) Modified on 6/4/2019 (nms).
May 22, 2019 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/5/2019. (nms)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court - filed by Shawn Mock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 , #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Ballard, Stephani) Modified on 5/22/2019 (nms).
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Division of State Police, Department of Safety and Homeland Security of the State of Delaware.(Martinelli, Adria)
May 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Court of Chancery, Case Number 2019-0229 MTZ (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2634831)- filed by Division of State Police, Department of Safety and Homeland Security of the State of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mock v. Division of State Police, Department of Safety and Homeland Security of the State of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Mock
Represented By: Stephani J. Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division of State Police, Department of Safety and Homeland Security of the State of Delaware
Represented By: Adria Benner Martinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?