Rabe et al v. Wittman
Plaintiff: Jeanette M. Rabe and Kevin S. Rabe
Defendant: Jonathan K. Wittman
Case Number: 1:2019cv00838
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Referring Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Daly on behalf of Jonathan K. Wittman (Daly, Daniel)
June 20, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The notice of appearance re-filed as D.I. 5 has been deleted again pursuant to conversation with counsel. Document will be re-filed at a later time. (lih)
June 20, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The notice of appearance previously filed as D.I. 5 has been deleted pursuant to conversation with filer. A revised version of the document will be filed at a later time. (lih)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORAL ORDER: The case is now referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for all purposes through the case dispositive motion deadline. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/20/2019. (nms)
June 19, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The waiver attached to D.I. 3 has been removed from that filing. Waivers are to be filed independent of other filings. (nms)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury 0f 12 Demanded, by Jonathan K. Wittman. (Leff, Thomas) Modified on 6/19/2019 (nms).
May 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 8, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed to filing party's office per request. (lak)
May 6, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Jonathan K. Wittman on 5/6/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ceg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Jonathan K. Wittman - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2635280.) - filed by Kevin S. Rabe, Jeanette M. Rabe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rabe et al v. Wittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette M. Rabe
Represented By: Tyler Sacchetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin S. Rabe
Represented By: Tyler Sacchetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan K. Wittman
Represented By: Thomas P. Leff
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?