Wildcat Licensing WI LLC v. Lear Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Wildcat Licensing WI LLC
Defendant: Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC and Lear Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00845
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC for Lear Corporation filed by Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC, Lear Corporation. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC, Lear Corporation.(Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 29, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Frank A. Angileri, Todd W. Dishman, and John M. Halan for Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC and Lear Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank A. Angileri, John M. Halan and Todd W. Dishman filed by Lear Corporation, Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/24/2019. (dlw)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Lear Corporation and Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 27, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC answer due 6/27/2019; Lear Corporation answer due 6/27/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/24/2019. (dlw)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank A. Angileri, John M. Halan and Todd W. Dishman - filed by Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC, Lear Corporation. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Lear Corporation and Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 27, 2019 - filed by Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC, Lear Corporation. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 21, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Peter F. Snell for Wildcat Licensing WI LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00833-MN et al.(ddp)
May 16, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Vincent M. Ferraro,Harold S. Laidlaw,Brad M. Scheller for Wildcat Licensing WI LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re (7 in 1:19-cv-00834-MN, 6 in 1:19-cv-00843-MN, 11 in 1:19-cv-00846-MN, 7 in 1:19-cv-00844-MN, 12 in 1:19-cv-00839-MN, 5 in 1:19-cv-00833-MN, 6 in 1:19-cv-00840-MN, 6 in 1:19-cv-00842-MN, 7 in 1:19-cv-00845-MN) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter F. Snell, Esquire, Brad M. Scheller, Esquire, Vincent M. Ferraro, Esquire, and Harold S. Laidlaw, Esquire filed by Wildcat Licensing WI LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/14/2019. (dlw)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter F. Snell, Esquire, Brad M. Scheller, Esquire, Vincent M. Ferraro, Esquire, and Harold S. Laidlaw, Esquire - filed by Wildcat Licensing WI LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Peter F. Snell, #2 Certification by Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Brad M. Scheller, #3 Certification by Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Vincent M. Ferraro, #4 Certification by Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Harold S. Laidlaw)(Brauerman, Stephen)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wildcat Licensing WI LLC. Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Brauerman, Stephen)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wildcat Licensing WI LLC. Lear Corporation served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Brauerman, Stephen)
May 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00833-MN, 1:19-cv-00834-MN, 1:19-cv-00839-MN, 1:19-cv-00840-MN and 1:19-cv-00842-MN through 1:19-cv-00846-MN (rjb)
May 7, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC on 5/7/2019; Lear Corporation on 5/7/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ceg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Wildcat Licensing WI LLC. (ceg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE47,220; RE47,232. (ceg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC, Lear Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2635408.) - filed by Wildcat Licensing WI LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wildcat Licensing WI LLC v. Lear Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wildcat Licensing WI LLC
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Vincent M. Ferraro
Represented By: Harold S. Laidlaw
Represented By: Peter F. Snell
Represented By: Brad M. Scheller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Todd W. Dishman
Represented By: John M. Halan
Represented By: Frank A. Angileri
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lear Corporation
Represented By: Todd W. Dishman
Represented By: John M. Halan
Represented By: Frank A. Angileri
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?