Miles v. Proctor and Gamble Manufacturing Company et al

Plaintiff: Kelvin Miles
Defendant: Proctor and Gamble Manufacturing Company and Astra Zeneca Pharmaceutical Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00871
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 Trust Fund Account Statement by Kelvin Miles (myr)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. Plaintiff shall submit trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form) ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 7/3/2019). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/3/2019. (lak)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED medical records re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Kelvin Miles. (lak)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Kelvin Miles. (lak)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Kelvin Miles. (lak)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff shall, within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order, either: (1) submit a long form (AO Form 239) application to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs (in forma pauperis), or (2) pay in full the $400.00 filing fee. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in dismissal of this case without prejudice. (Copy to plaintiff w/ Mag. Consent Form) (*Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/6/2019.). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/16/2019. (amf)
May 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Astra Zeneca Pharmaceutical Company, Proctor and Gamble Manufacturing Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (No IFP, No Fee Paid) - filed by Kelvin Miles.(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. Proctor and Gamble Manufacturing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proctor and Gamble Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astra Zeneca Pharmaceutical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?