Kennedy v. United States et al
Plaintiff: Edward Thomas Kennedy
Defendant: United States, Leonard P. Stark and Richard G. Andrews
Case Number: 1:2019cv00893
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. On May 16, 2019, the Court ordered Plaintiff to either submit an application to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs (long form application AO 239) or to pay the $400 filing fee in full. Plaintiff was warned that the failure to submit a complete application to proceed without prepayment of fees or to pay the filing fee in full, within 21 days from the date of the Order, would result in dismissal of the case. (D.I. #4 ) The time has passed and Plaintiff has failed to comply with the May 16, 2019 Order. THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that the Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to comply with the May 16, 2019 Order. (copy to pltf.) (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/28/2019. (nmg)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The Clerk of Court shall provide the plaintiff with a copy of the long form application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs, form AO 239. The plaintiff shall, within twenty-one days from the date of this order, either: (1) fully complete long form AO 239 application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs, or (2) pay in full the $400.00 filing fee. Failure to timely comply with this order may result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. (Copy to plaintiff) (*Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/6/2019) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/16/2019. (amf)
May 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against Richard G. Andrews, Leonard P. Stark, United States - filed by Edward Thomas Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Edward Thomas Kennedy. (nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard P. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard G. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Thomas Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?