Jones v. Thompson
Plaintiff: Matthew Jones
Defendant: Denissa Thompson and Recovery Innovations
Case Number: 1:2019cv00897
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to the Court, from Matthew Jones, requesting service of the Complaint.(lak) Modified on 5/23/2019 (nms).
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The application to proceed without prepaying fees or costs under 28 U.S.C. 1915 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/16/2019. (amf) Modified on 5/16/2019 (nms).
May 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00895-RGA, 1:19-cv-00896-RGA, 1:19-cv-00897-RGA(nmg)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against Denissa Thompson - filed by Matthew Jones.(ceg)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Matthew Jones. (ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denissa Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recovery Innovations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?