Sapp et al v. Industrial Action Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kevin B Sapp, Jamie Hooper and Jamie Hopper
Defendant: Reladyne, LLC and Industrial Action Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00912
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 34 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Kevin B Sapp, Jamie Hopper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lintner, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SO ORDER Granting #32 Stipulated Consent to File Amended Complaint and Stipulation Relating to Scheduling (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Industrial Action Services, LLC answer due 8/1/2019; Reladyne, LLC answer due 8/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2019) (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/18/2019. (nms)
June 18, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATION regarding Consent to File Amended Complaint and Relating to Scheduling, by Jamie Hopper, Kevin B Sapp. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Lintner, Matthew) Modified on 6/18/2019 (nms).
June 18, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Alberto E. Chavez on behalf of Jamie Hopper, Kevin B Sapp (Chavez, Alberto)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 6/25/2019, at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/10/2019. (nms)
June 7, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Edward D. Shapiro and Irving M. Geslewitz for Industrial Action Services, LLC and Reladyne, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
June 7, 2019 Filing 29 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #28 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anthony, David)
June 7, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings - filed by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anthony, David) Modified on 6/10/2019 (nms).
June 6, 2019 Filing 27 Joint STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, by Jamie Hopper, Kevin B Sapp. (Carroll, Albert) Modified on 6/7/2019 (nms).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kelsey D. Ratz, filed by Jamie Hopper, Kevin B Sapp, and #25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew J. Mussalli, filed by Jamie Hopper, Kevin B Sapp. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/6/2019. (nms)
June 6, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kelsey D. Ratz - filed by Jamie Hopper, Kevin B Sapp. (Carroll, Albert)
June 6, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew J. Mussalli - filed by Jamie Hopper, Kevin B Sapp. (Carroll, Albert)
June 6, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew F. Lintner on behalf of Jamie Hopper, Kevin B Sapp (Lintner, Matthew)
June 6, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert J. Carroll on behalf of Jamie Hopper, Kevin B Sapp (Carroll, Albert)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Irving M. Geslewitz, filed by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC, #21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward D. Shapiro, filed by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/28/2019. (nms)
May 24, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Irving M. Geslewitz - filed by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certificate of Service)(Anthony, David) Modified on 5/28/2019 (nms).
May 24, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward D. Shapiro - filed by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certificate of Service)(Anthony, David) Modified on 5/28/2019 (nms).
May 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance, by David B. Anthony and Peter McGiveny on behalf of All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Anthony, David) Modified on 5/22/2019 (nms).
May 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
May 16, 2019 Filing 19 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/17/2019. (lak)
May 16, 2019 Filing 18 Record of case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number in Other District: 4:19-cv-00882. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to District of Delaware(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Kevin B Sapp, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Mussalli, Matthew) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Motion to Transfer Venue by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Appendix of Unpublished Cases Cited)(Sponsel, Thane) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY in Support of #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Delaware, filed by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Appendix of Unreported Cases)(Sponsel, Thane) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Delaware filed by Kevin B Sapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Proposed Order)(Mussalli, Matthew) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC, filed.(Sponsel, Thane) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.]
March 30, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC, filed.(Sponsel, Thane) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jamie Hooper, Kevin B Sapp, filed.(Mussalli, Matthew) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 Submission Regarding Identity and Citizenship of Members of Defendants in Support of Notice of Removal by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sponsel, Thane) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to #5 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b) , filed by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC. (Sponsel, Thane) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED PETITION against All Defendants filed by Kevin B Sapp.(Mussalli, Matthew) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 Opposed Motion for Extension of Time, filed by Kevin B Sapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mussalli, Matthew) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b) by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sponsel, Thane) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Industrial Action Services, LLC and RelaDyne, LLC within 10 days after the entry of this Order, shall file verified proof indicating the identity and citizenship of any and all members of Defendants Industrial Action Services, LLC and RelaDyne, LLC, traced through each layer of each entity, however many there may be. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified. (marflores, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Delaware by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order for Motion to Transfer)(Sponsel, Thane) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/12/2019 at 03:30 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Harris County 127th, case number 2019-10428 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22035760) filed by Reladyne, LLC, Industrial Action Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Sponsel, Thane) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sapp et al v. Industrial Action Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin B Sapp
Represented By: Matthew F. Lintner
Represented By: Albert J. Carroll
Represented By: Alberto E. Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Hopper
Represented By: Matthew F. Lintner
Represented By: Albert J. Carroll
Represented By: Alberto E. Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reladyne, LLC
Represented By: Edward D. Shapiro
Represented By: Irving M. Geslewitz
Represented By: Peter C. McGivney
Represented By: David B. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Action Services, LLC
Represented By: Edward D. Shapiro
Represented By: Irving M. Geslewitz
Represented By: Peter C. McGivney
Represented By: David B. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?