Gentex Corporation v. Revision Military Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Gentex Corporation
Defendant: Revision Military, Inc. and Revision Military Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00921
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 17, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Revision Military Ltd. answer due 7/17/2019; Revision Military, Inc. answer due 7/17/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/7/2019. (dlw)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (and proposed order) to move, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 17, 2019 - filed by Revision Military Ltd., Revision Military, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
May 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gentex Corporation. Revision Military Ltd. served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Dudash, Amy)
May 17, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Revision Military Ltd. and Revision Military, Inc. on 5/17/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (amf)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by Gentex Corporation. (amf)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,849,517; 7,908,667; 8,028,344; 9,072,328; 9,717,294; D788,378; D794,256; D750,846; and D750,847. (amf)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Revision Military Ltd. and Revision Military, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2645473) - filed by Gentex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentex Corporation v. Revision Military Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revision Military, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revision Military Ltd.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gentex Corporation
Represented By: John V. Gorman
Represented By: Amy Michele Dudash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?