In Re: Allonhill, LLC

Appellee: Allonhill, LLC
Appellant: Stewart Lender Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00938
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 Remark: An order has been entered in this appeal directing consolidation of the appeal under Civ. A. No. 19-cv-00879-LPS. The docket in Civ. A. No. 19-cv-00879-LPS should be consulted for all matters affecting this appeal. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00879-LPS, 1:19-cv-00938-LPS (ntl)
June 24, 2019 Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:19-cv-00879-LPS. (ntl)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 Joint STIPULATED Order Consolidating Appeal and Cross-Appeal for Procedural Purposes filed by Allonhill, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/24/19. (ntl)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Order Consolidating Appeal and Cross-Appeal for Procedural Purposes by Allonhill, LLC. (Miller, Evan)
June 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew J. Gallo for Stewart Lender Services, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 12, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nathaniel P. Bruhn for Stewart Lender Services, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (amf)
June 12, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Samuel R. Rowley for Stewart Lender Services, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (amf)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #8 Designation of Record on Appeal,,,,,,,,, Exhibit 87 of Exhibit A to Stewart Lender Services, Inc.'s Statement of Issues and Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal by Stewart Lender Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mangan, Kevin)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Stewart Lender Services, Inc. // Stewart Lender Services, Inc.'s Statement of Issues and Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64, #66 Exhibit 65, #67 Exhibit 66, #68 Exhibit 67, #69 Exhibit 68, #70 Exhibit 69, #71 Exhibit 70, #72 Exhibit 71, #73 Exhibit 72, #74 Exhibit 73, #75 Exhibit 74, #76 Exhibit 75, #77 Exhibit 76, #78 Exhibit 77, #79 Exhibit 78, #80 Exhibit 79, #81 Exhibit 80, #82 Exhibit 81, #83 Exhibit 82, #84 Exhibit 83, #85 Exhibit 84, #86 Exhibit 85, #87 Exhibit 86, #88 Exhibit 88, #89 Exhibit 89, #90 Exhibit 90, #91 Exhibit 91, #92 Exhibit 92, #93 Exhibit 93, #94 Exhibit 94, #95 Exhibit 95, #96 Exhibit 96, #97 Exhibit 97, #98 Exhibit 98, #99 Exhibit 99, #100 Exhibit 100, #101 Exhibit 101, #102 Exhibit 102, #103 Exhibit 103, #104 Exhibit 104, #105 Exhibit 105, #106 Exhibit 106, #107 Exhibit 107, #108 Exhibit 108, #109 Exhibit B, #110 Certificate of Service)(Mangan, Kevin)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nathaniel P. Bruhn filed by Stewart Lender Services, Inc., #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew J. Gallo filed by Stewart Lender Services, Inc., #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samuel R. Rowley filed by Stewart Lender Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/5/19. (ntl)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/4/19. (cak)
May 29, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nathaniel P. Bruhn - filed by Stewart Lender Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification)(Mangan, Kevin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samuel R. Rowley - filed by Stewart Lender Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification)(Mangan, Kevin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew J. Gallo - filed by Stewart Lender Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification)(Mangan, Kevin)
May 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 .ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Tuesday, June 11, 2019, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/21/19. (cak)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Cross Appeal. (nmg)
May 20, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Cross-Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (nmg)
May 20, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (nmg)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of CROSS APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 4/25/2019 by Judge Kevin Gross in Bankruptcy case number 14-10663 KG. Fee Status Paid. - filed by Stewart Lender Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Opinion on Appeal, #3 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Allonhill, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Allonhill, LLC
Represented By: Evan Thomas Miller
Represented By: Neil Glassman
Represented By: Sophie Elizabeth Macon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Stewart Lender Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Represented By: Kevin J. Mangan
Represented By: Andrew J. Gallo
Represented By: Samuel R. Rowley
Represented By: Nathaniel P. Bruhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?