In re: Imerys Talc America, Inc.

Appellee: Imerys Talc America, Inc. and Future Claimants' Representative
Appellant: Cyprus Historical Excess Insurers
Case Number: 1:2019cv00944
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Marcos A. Ramos regarding Proposed Briefing Schedule - re #6 Letter, #5 Letter. (Ramos, Marcos)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Cyprus Historical Excess Insurers // Appellants' Corrected Designation of Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/15/2019 (dlw).
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Imerys Talc America, Inc., Future Claimants' Representative // Designation of Additional Items to be Included in Record of Appeal (Harron, Edwin) Modified on 7/15/2019 (dlw).
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Stamatios Stamoulis regarding briefing schedule. (Weinblatt, Richard)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Marcos A. Ramos regarding briefing schedule. (Ramos, Marcos)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/17/19. (cak)
May 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Wednesday, June 12, 2019, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/22/19. (cak)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (ddp) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/22/2019) (ddp).
May 22, 2019 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (ddp)
May 22, 2019 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (ddp)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 5/8/2019 by The Honorable Laurie Selber Silverstein in Bankruptcy case number 19-10289 LSS. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Cyprus Historical Excess Insurers. (Attachments: #1 Bench Ruling on Motion, #2 Bankruptcy Appeal Transmittal)(ddp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Represented By: Brett Michael Haywood
Represented By: Mark David Collins
Represented By: Michael J. Merchant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Future Claimants' Representative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cyprus Historical Excess Insurers
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?