Quality Care for Men Health MGMT, LLC et al v. Quality Care for Men, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Stephen Sewalk and Quality Care for Men Health MGMT, LLC
Defendant: Rainstorm Media Group, Inc., Jessica Jones and Quality Care for Men, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00951
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Quality Care for Men, LLC, Rainstorm Media Group, Inc.. (Silverman, Andrew)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/22/2019, at 2:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/11/2019. (nms)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to 07/08/2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Jessica Jones answer due 7/8/2019; Quality Care for Men, LLC answer due 7/8/2019; Rainstorm Media Group, Inc. answer due 7/8/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/9/2019. (nms)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIMS against All Plaintiffs by Rainstorm Media Group, Inc., Jessica Jones, Quality Care for Men, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D)(Silverman, Andrew) Modified on 7/9/2019 (nms).
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to 07/08/2019 - filed by Jessica Jones, Quality Care for Men, LLC, Rainstorm Media Group, Inc.. (Silverman, Andrew) Modified on 7/9/2019 (nms).
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Ross Silverman on behalf of All Defendants (Silverman, Andrew)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to 7/3/19 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Jessica Jones answer due 7/3/2019; Quality Care for Men, LLC answer due 7/3/2019; Rainstorm Media Group, Inc. answer due 7/3/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/13/2019. (nms)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to 7/3/19 - filed by Quality Care for Men Health MGMT, LLC, Stephen Sewalk. (Miller, Rick)
June 13, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The filing at D.I. 3 has been removed from the docket. The docket text for the filing indicated the document was a stipulation yet when the filing was opened it was a pdf for a certification for a J. Stasny, Esq. to a pro hac motion. (nms)
May 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 28, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Jessica Jones on 5/28/2019; Quality Care for Men, LLC on 5/28/2019; Rainstorm Media Group, Inc. on 5/28/2019. (lak)
May 23, 2019 No Summons Issued. (amf)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR DECLARATORY AND EQUITABLE RELIEF - filed with Jury Demand against Jessica Jones, Quality Care for Men, LLC, and Rainstorm Media Group, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2649024) - filed by Quality Care for Men Health MGMT, LLC and Stephen Sewalk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A, #2 Exhibit 1-B, #3 Exhibit 1-C, #4 Exhibit 2-A, #5 Exhibit 2-B, #6 Exhibit 2-C, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quality Care for Men Health MGMT, LLC et al v. Quality Care for Men, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainstorm Media Group, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Ross Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Jones
Represented By: Andrew Ross Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Care for Men, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Ross Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Sewalk
Represented By: Rick S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quality Care for Men Health MGMT, LLC
Represented By: Rick S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?